EP2779664 - Synchronizing multiple transmissions of content [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 30.07.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Comcast Cable Communications, LLC 1701 JFK Boulevard Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | [2014/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sharma, Sudhanshu c/o Comcast Cable Communications, LLC 1701 JFK Boulevard Philadelphia, PA Pennsylvania 19103 / US | 02 /
Mora, James D. c/o Comcast Cable Communications, LLC 1701 JFK Boulevard Philadelphia, PA Pennsylvania 19103 / US | [2014/38] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2014/38] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 14159227.9 | 12.03.2014 | [2014/38] | Priority number, date | US201313798843 | 13.03.2013 Original published format: US201313798843 | [2014/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2779664 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2779664 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | [2014/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/24, H04N21/242, H04N21/422, H04N21/43 | [2014/40] | CPC: |
H04L67/1095 (EP,US);
H04N21/2408 (EP,US);
H04N21/242 (EP,US);
H04N21/41265 (EP,US);
H04N21/6332 (US);
H04N21/8545 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/19] |
Former [2014/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Synchronisierung mehrerer Übertragungen von Inhalt | [2014/38] | English: | Synchronizing multiple transmissions of content | [2014/38] | French: | Synchronisation de transmissions multiples de contenu | [2014/38] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/19] | 12.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/51] | 10.07.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/51] | 31.07.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.07.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012002111 (SANDOVAL FRANK [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0038] * * claim - * * figure - *; | [X]WO2011053271 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1 * * page 4, line 25 - page 14, line 3 * * claim - * * figure - *; | [X]WO2012154541 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, line 28 - page 3, line 2 * * page 14, line 18 - line 26 * * claim - * * figure - *; | [A]WO2012094105 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US8381259 (KHOSLA VINOD [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A] - BORONAT F ET AL, "Multimedia group and inter-stream synchronization techniques: A comparative study", INFORMATION SYSTEMS, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, vol. 34, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.IS.2008.05.001, ISSN 0306-4379, (20090301), pages 108 - 131, (20080524), XP025644936 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.is.2008.05.001 |