EP2743012 - Bending apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel & Sumitomo Metal Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2014/45] |
Former [2014/25] | For all designated states Nippon Steel & Sumitomo Metal Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | ||
For all designated states Sumitomo Pipe & Tube Co., Ltd. 3-5, Oaza Hikari Kashima-shi Ibaraki 314-0014 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuwayama, Shinjiro c/o Sumitomo Metal Industries Ltd. 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka, 541-0041 / JP | 02 /
Tomizawa, Atsushi c/o Sumitomo Metal Industries Ltd. 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka, 541-0041 / JP | 03 /
Inoue, Saburo c/o Sumitomo Pipe & Tube Co., Ltd. 3-5 Oaza Hikari Kashima-shi Ibaraki, 314-0014 / JP | [2014/25] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2015/49] |
Former [2014/25] | Zimmermann & Partner Josephspitalstr. 15 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14159558.7 | 17.05.2010 | [2014/25] | Priority number, date | JP20090120844 | 19.05.2009 Original published format: JP 2009120844 | [2014/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2743012 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2743012 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B21D7/16 | [2014/25] | CPC: |
B21D7/12 (EP,US);
B21D7/16 (KR);
B21D7/162 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/49] |
Former [2014/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Biegevorrichtung | [2014/25] | English: | Bending apparatus | [2014/25] | French: | Dispositif de cintrage | [2014/25] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/01] | 28.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.10.2015 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 06.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10777728.6 / EP2433722 | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.05.2010 | AL | 02.12.2015 | AT | 02.12.2015 | BE | 02.12.2015 | BG | 02.12.2015 | CY | 02.12.2015 | CZ | 02.12.2015 | DK | 02.12.2015 | EE | 02.12.2015 | FI | 02.12.2015 | HR | 02.12.2015 | IT | 02.12.2015 | LT | 02.12.2015 | LV | 02.12.2015 | MC | 02.12.2015 | MK | 02.12.2015 | NL | 02.12.2015 | PL | 02.12.2015 | RO | 02.12.2015 | SE | 02.12.2015 | SI | 02.12.2015 | SK | 02.12.2015 | SM | 02.12.2015 | TR | 02.12.2015 | NO | 02.03.2016 | GR | 03.03.2016 | IS | 02.04.2016 | PT | 04.04.2016 | GB | 17.05.2016 | IE | 17.05.2016 | LU | 17.05.2016 | CH | 31.05.2016 | LI | 31.05.2016 | MT | 31.05.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 17.05.2010 | |
AT | 02.12.2015 | ||
BE | 02.12.2015 | ||
BG | 02.12.2015 | ||
CY | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
MK | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
TR | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
GB | 17.05.2016 | ||
IE | 17.05.2016 | ||
LU | 17.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 17.05.2010 | |
AT | 02.12.2015 | ||
BE | 02.12.2015 | ||
BG | 02.12.2015 | ||
CY | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
MK | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
GB | 17.05.2016 | ||
IE | 17.05.2016 | ||
LU | 17.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 17.05.2010 | |
AT | 02.12.2015 | ||
BE | 02.12.2015 | ||
CY | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
MK | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
GB | 17.05.2016 | ||
IE | 17.05.2016 | ||
LU | 17.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 17.05.2010 | |
AT | 02.12.2015 | ||
BE | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
MK | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
GB | 17.05.2016 | ||
IE | 17.05.2016 | ||
LU | 17.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
BE | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
GB | 17.05.2016 | ||
IE | 17.05.2016 | ||
LU | 17.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
BE | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
LU | 17.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
BE | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
LU | 17.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
BE | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | LT | 02.12.2015 | |
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 02.12.2015 | |
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 02.12.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2008123506 (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * figures 1,18,19,20 *; | [Y]JP2000126821 (BABCOCK HITACHI KK) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *; | [Y]JP2009050903 (DAI ICHI HIGH FREQUENCY CO LTD) [Y] 1-15 * figures 1,3 * | by applicant | - JIDOSHA GIJUSTSU, JOURNAL OF SOCIETY OF AUTOMOTIVE ENGINEERS OF JAPAN, (2003), vol. 57, no. 6, pages 23 - 28 |