EP2784648 - Visualization of an object using a visual query system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.05.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/40] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prazak, Nikoli E. P.O. Box 3707, MC 7J-41 Seattle, WA 98124 / US | 02 /
Gass, John Carney 100 North Riverside Plaza 60606-2016 Chicago, IL / US | [2014/51] |
Former [2014/40] | 01 /
Prazak, Nikoli E. P.O. Box 3707, MC 7J-41 Seattle, WA 98124 / US | ||
02 /
Gass, John Carney 2810 160th Avenue SE MC 7J-41 Bellevue, WA 98008 / US | Representative(s) | Morrall, Jonathan Ian McLachlan Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/40] | Morrall, Jonathan Ian McLachlan Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14159760.9 | 14.03.2014 | [2014/40] | Priority number, date | US201313852063 | 28.03.2013 Original published format: US201313852063 | [2014/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2784648 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2784648 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | [2014/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0484, G06F3/0481, G06T19/00 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
G06F3/04815 (EP,CN,US);
G06F16/00 (EP,US);
G06F16/532 (EP,US);
G06F3/0482 (US);
G06F3/04842 (EP,CN,US);
G06F30/15 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Visualisierung eines Objekts unter Verwendung eines visuellen Abfragesystems | [2014/40] | English: | Visualization of an object using a visual query system | [2014/40] | French: | Visualisation d'un objet au moyen d'un système d'interrogation visuelle | [2014/40] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/40] | 24.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/26] | 21.12.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 25.04.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/26] | Appeal following examination | 24.02.2017 | Appeal received No. T1098/17 | 25.04.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.01.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006119601 (FINLAYSON JOHN W [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9-15 * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0057] * * page 67 * * paragraph [0147] * * paragraph [0150] - paragraph [0152] * * paragraph [0154] - paragraph [0159] * * figures 1-2 * * figure 26 * * figures 28-31 * [I] 8; | [X]US2009013281 (HELFMAN JONATHAN [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0104] * * paragraph [0109] * * figures 1-2 * * figures 4-5 * * figure 16 ** figure 18 * |