EP2891564 - Tire pressure sensor device setting method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CUB Elecparts Inc. No. 6, Ln. 546, Sec. 6 Zhanglu Rd. Fuxing Township Changhua County / TW | [2015/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yu, San-Chuan No. 12, Ln. 546, Sec. 6, Zhanglu Rd., Fuxing Township Changhua County / TW | 02 /
Wang, Tsan-Nung c/o Cub Elecparts Inc. No.6, Ln. 546, Sec. 6, Zhanglu Rd., Fuxing Township Changhua County / TW | 03 /
Hu, Chao-Ching No. 6, Guangming Rd., Shanhua Dist. Tainan City / TW | 04 /
Chen, Chi-Hung No.10-9, Tong'an Ln., Fuxing Township Changhua County / TW | [2015/28] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/28] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14159784.9 | 14.03.2014 | [2015/28] | Priority number, date | TW20140100543 | 07.01.2014 Original published format: TW 103100543 | [2015/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2891564 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2891564 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B60C23/04 | [2015/28] | CPC: |
B60C23/0472 (EP,US);
B60C23/0471 (EP,US);
B60C23/0479 (EP,US);
G06K7/10198 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/08] |
Former [2015/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Einstellung einer Reifendrucksensorvorrichtung | [2015/28] | English: | Tire pressure sensor device setting method | [2015/28] | French: | Procédé de réglage de dispositif de capteur de pression de pneu | [2015/28] | Examination procedure | 07.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/08] | 04.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.03.2014 | AL | 14.06.2017 | AT | 14.06.2017 | CY | 14.06.2017 | CZ | 14.06.2017 | DK | 14.06.2017 | EE | 14.06.2017 | FI | 14.06.2017 | HR | 14.06.2017 | LT | 14.06.2017 | LV | 14.06.2017 | MC | 14.06.2017 | MK | 14.06.2017 | PT | 14.06.2017 | RO | 14.06.2017 | RS | 14.06.2017 | SI | 14.06.2017 | SK | 14.06.2017 | SM | 14.06.2017 | TR | 14.06.2017 | BG | 14.09.2017 | NO | 14.09.2017 | GR | 15.09.2017 | IS | 14.10.2017 | IE | 14.03.2018 | LU | 14.03.2018 | MT | 14.03.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 14.03.2014 | |
AT | 14.06.2017 | ||
CY | 14.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
MK | 14.06.2017 | ||
PT | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
TR | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
IE | 14.03.2018 | ||
LU | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 14.03.2014 | |
AT | 14.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
PT | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
TR | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
IE | 14.03.2018 | ||
LU | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
PT | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
TR | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
IE | 14.03.2018 | ||
LU | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
TR | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
IE | 14.03.2018 | ||
LU | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
IE | 14.03.2018 | ||
LU | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
IE | 14.03.2018 | ||
LU | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
LU | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 14.06.2017 | |
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 14.06.2017 | |
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2003227379 (ITOU SHINTAROU [JP]) [X] 1 * the whole document * * feature (b); paragraph [0248] * * feature (c);; figure 15 * [I] 2-10; | [XA]US2012268263 (LEE KYU CHEOL [KR], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-10 |