EP2922028 - Exploiting residual projection data and reference data for processing data produced by imaging modality [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2016 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | For all designated states Technische Universität Ilmenau Ehrenbergstraße 29 98684 Ilmenau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/39] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
For all designated states Technische Universität Ilmenau Ehrenbergstraße 29 98684 Ilmenau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Del Galdo, Giovanni Neue Länder 20 98693 Martinroda / DE | 02 /
Römer, Florian Hangeberg 2b 98693 Ilmenau / DE | 03 /
Großmann, Marcus Alexandrinenstr. 26 99894 Friedrichroda / DE | 04 /
Oeckl, Steven Theodor-von-Zahn-Str. 25 91052 Erlangen / DE | 05 /
Schön, Tobias Georg-Stefan-Str. 14 90453 Nürnberg / DE | [2015/39] | Representative(s) | Schenk, Markus Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2015/39] | Application number, filing date | 14160311.8 | 17.03.2014 | [2015/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2922028 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06T11/00 | [2015/39] | CPC: |
G06T11/005 (EP);
G06T2211/436 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Nutzung von Projektionsdaten und Referenzdaten zur Datenverarbeitung durch Bildgebungsmodalität | [2015/39] | English: | Exploiting residual projection data and reference data for processing data produced by imaging modality | [2015/39] | French: | Exploitation de données de projection résiduelle et données de référence pour traiter des données produites par modalité d'imagerie | [2015/39] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/38] | 03.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/38] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB2192120 (GEN ELECTRIC) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,9,11,12,15 * abstract * * figures 1-7 * [I] 3,6,7,10,13,14; | [XI]US2007076928 (CLAUS BERNHARD E H [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,9,11,12,15 * the whole document *[I] 3,6,7,10,13,14; | [XI]WO2008099314 (PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,9,11,12,15 * the whole document * [I] 3,6,7,10,13,14 | by applicant | US4878169 | US2011044546 | US2011058719 | US8509514 | - E.J. CANDES, "Robust uncertainty principles: exact signal reconstruction from highly incomplete frequency information", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION THEORY, (2006), vol. 52, doi:doi:10.1109/TIT.2005.862083, pages 489 - 509, XP002491493 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIT.2005.862083 | - D.L. DONOHO, "Compressed sensing", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION THEORY, (2006), vol. 52, pages 1289 - 1306 | - JAMES GREGSON; MICHAEL KRIMERMAN; MATTHIAS B. HULLIN; WOLFGANG HEIDRICH., "Stochastic tomography and its applications in 3d imaging of mixing fluids", ACM TRANS. GRAPH. (PROC. SIGGRAPH 2012, (2012), vol. 31, no. 4, pages 52,1 - 52,10 |