EP2782069 - Apparatus, method and program for graph display control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Casio Computer Co., Ltd. 6-2, Hon-machi 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8543 / JP | [2014/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshizawa, Hiroaki c/o Casio Computer, Co., Ltd., Hamura R&D Center 2-1, Sakae-cho 3-come Hamura-shi, Tokyo 205-8555 / JP | [2014/39] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/39] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14160530.3 | 18.03.2014 | [2014/39] | Priority number, date | JP20130057561 | 21.03.2013 Original published format: JP 2013057561 | [2014/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2782069 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2782069 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06T11/60, G06F3/0481, G09G5/37, G09G5/377, G06F15/02, G06T11/20 | [2017/47] | CPC: |
G06T11/206 (EP,US);
G09G5/37 (US);
G06F15/02 (EP,US);
G06F15/025 (EP,US);
G06F3/04812 (US);
G06T11/60 (US);
G06T3/00 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/39] | G06T11/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung, Verfahren und Programm zur Graphanzeigesteuerung | [2014/39] | English: | Apparatus, method and program for graph display control | [2014/39] | French: | Appareil, procédé et programme de commande d'affichage d'un graphique | [2014/39] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/39] | 24.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.12.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH11161612 (SHARP KK) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] - paragraphs [0005] , [0006] *; | [I]JP2004118727 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD) [I] 1,8,9 * abstract *; | [ID]JP2011039689 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD) [ID] 1,8,9 * abstract * * figures 1-9 *; | [XI] - HANC J ET AL, "Geogebra - A complex digital tool for highly effective math and science teaching", EMERGING ELEARNING TECHNOLOGIES AND APPLICATIONS (ICETA), 2011 9TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20111027), doi:10.1109/ICETA.2011.6112601, ISBN 978-1-4577-0051-4, pages 131 - 136, XP032079264 [X] 1,7-9 * abstract * * section "I. Introduction" * * section "II. Dynamic geometrical systems" * * section "III. Integration of Geogebra into the methodical textbooks for math teachers" * * section "V. Integration of Geogebra teaching and learning materials for science subjects" * [I] 2-6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICETA.2011.6112601 | [I] - Anonymous, "GeoGebra - Wikipedia", (20130316), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=GeoGebra&oldid=544601442, (20171005), XP055412945 [I] 1-9 * section "Dynamic geometry, algebra and calculus" * | [A] - Anonymous, "List of interactive geometry software - Wikipedia", (20130311), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=List_of_interactive_geometry_software&oldid=543429331, (20171005), XP055412947 [A] 1-9 * section "General features"; section "GeoGebra" * | [XPI] - KRAWCZYK-STAMDO DOROTA ET AL, "Some examples from historical mathematical textbook with using GeoGebra", 2013 SECOND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON E-LEARNING AND E-TECHNOLOGIES IN EDUCATION (ICEEE), IEEE, (20130923), doi:10.1109/ICELETE.2013.6644375, pages 207 - 211, XP032514501 [XP] 1,8,9 * abstract * [I] 2-7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICeLeTE.2013.6644375 | by applicant | JP2011039689 |