EP2793398 - Non-contact operation detection device for vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi, 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP | [2014/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirota, Koichi c/o AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA, Intellectual Property Department 1, Asahi-machi, 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP | 02 /
Urase, Hiroshi c/o AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA, Intellectual Property Department 1, Asahi-machi, 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP | 03 /
Takayanagi, Hitoshi c/o AISIN ENGINEERING CO., LTD. 1-1, Aioi-cho, 1-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-0027 / JP | [2014/43] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2014/43] | Application number, filing date | 14161225.9 | 24.03.2014 | [2014/43] | Priority number, date | JP20130087934 | 19.04.2013 Original published format: JP 2013087934 | [2014/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2793398 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2793398 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/955 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
H03K17/955 (EP,US);
G01R27/2605 (US);
H03K2217/960765 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/32] |
Former [2014/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kontaktlose Betriebsvorrichtung für ein Fahrzeug | [2014/43] | English: | Non-contact operation detection device for vehicle | [2014/43] | French: | Dispositif de détection de fonctionnement sans contact pour véhicule | [2014/43] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/32] | 24.10.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2400666 (AUTOMOTIVE ELECTRONICS LTD AB [GB]) [A] 1-3,7,9 * the whole document * * page 5, paragraph 3; figure 2 * * page 11, line L - page 13, line 2 *; | [XAY]US2005236846 (HIDAKA OSAMU [JP], et al) [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038]; figure 8 * [A] 2,3 [Y] 7; | [A]DE102006008281 (IDENT TECHNOLOGY AG [DE]) [A] 1-3,7,9* figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE102007012111 (IDENT TECHNOLOGY AG [DE]) [A] 1-3,7,9 * the whole document *; | [A]US2011276234 (VAN GASTEL PETER [DE]) [A] 1-3,7,9 * the whole document *; | [YA] - Luben Hristov, "Capacitive Proximity Detection in the Automotive Industry", Automotive Compilation, Vol. 7, (20100101), pages 21 - 23, URL: http://www.atmel.com/Images/Article_AC7_Capacitive-Proximity-Detection.pdf, (20140709), XP055127979 [Y] 7 * the whole document * * figure 4 * [A] 1-3,9 | by applicant | JP4514603B |