EP2749282 - Method of treating atrial fibrillation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City California 94404 / US | [2014/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Antzelevitch, Charles 101 Sylvan Way New Hartford, NY New York 13413 / US | 02 /
Belardinelli, Luiz 205 Manzanita Ave. Palo Alto, CA California 94304 / US | 03 /
Burashnikov, Alexander 59 Imperial Dr. New Hartford, NY New York 13413 / US | 04 /
Shryock, John 2313 Vines Ct. East Palo Alto, CA California 94303 / US | 05 /
Zeng, Dewan 871 Sycamore Dr. Palo Alto, CA California 94303 / US | [2014/27] | Representative(s) | Wallace, Sheila Jane, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/27] | Wallace, Sheila Jane, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 14161300.0 | 20.12.2010 | [2014/27] | Priority number, date | US20090288739P | 21.12.2009 Original published format: US 288739 P | [2014/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2749282 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2749282 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/343, A61K31/495, A61P9/06 | [2014/27] | CPC: |
A61K31/495 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/343 (EP,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/343, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/495, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] |
Former [2014/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 19.12.2014 | ME | 19.12.2014 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON VORHOFFLIMMERN | [2016/47] | English: | Method of treating atrial fibrillation | [2014/27] | French: | METHODE DE TRAITEMENT DE LA FIBRILLATION AURICULAIRE | [2016/47] |
Former [2014/27] | Verfahren zur Behandlung von Vorhofflimmern | ||
Former [2014/27] | Méthode de traitement de la fibrillation auriculaire | Examination procedure | 19.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/05] | 09.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10798436.1 / EP2515900 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20100798436) is 03.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.12.2010 | AL | 09.08.2017 | CY | 09.08.2017 | DK | 09.08.2017 | EE | 09.08.2017 | FI | 09.08.2017 | HR | 09.08.2017 | LT | 09.08.2017 | LV | 09.08.2017 | MC | 09.08.2017 | MK | 09.08.2017 | RO | 09.08.2017 | RS | 09.08.2017 | SM | 09.08.2017 | BG | 09.11.2017 | IS | 09.12.2017 | LU | 20.12.2017 | MT | 20.12.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2019/52] | HU | 20.12.2010 | |
CY | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
MK | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 20.12.2010 | |
CY | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 20.12.2010 | |
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | DK | 09.08.2017 | |
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | DK | 09.08.2017 | |
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/26] | DK | 09.08.2017 | |
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | DK | 09.08.2017 | |
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | DK | 09.08.2017 | |
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 09.08.2017 | |
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | FI | 09.08.2017 | |
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 09.08.2017 | |
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 09.08.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2009150535 (SANOFI AVENTIS [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 2, lines 15-17; claim 1 *; | [AD] - FOR THE ERATO STUDY INVESTIGATORS ET AL, "Dronedarone for the control of ventricular rate in permanent atrial fibrillation: The Efficacy and safety of dRonedArone for The cOntrol of ventricular rate during atrial fibrillation (ERATO) study", AMERICAN HEART JOURNAL, MOSBY- YEAR BOOK INC, US, vol. 156, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.AHJ.2008.06.010, ISSN 0002-8703, (200809), pages 527.E1 - 527.E9, (20080827), XP025470440 [AD] 1-15 * abstract * * page 527.e2, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 527.e7, column 2, paragraph 4 - page 527.e8, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ahj.2008.06.010 | [A] - KUMAR KAPIL ET AL, "New and emerging antiarrhythmic drugs for atrial fibrillation: what may become available to the clinician in the near future.", CURRENT TREATMENT OPTIONS IN CARDIOVASCULAR MEDICINE, (200910), vol. 11, no. 5, ISSN 1534-3189, pages 373 - 380, XP002631255 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 374, paragraph 6 - page 375, paragraph 1 * * page 378, paragraphs 2-3 * | [AD] - ANTZELEVITCH C ET AL, "Atrial-selective sodium channel block as a novel strategy for the management of atrial fibrillation", JOURNAL OF ELECTROCARDIOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, vol. 42, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.JELECTROCARD.2009.07.007, ISSN 0022-0736, (200911), pages 543 - 548, (20090820), XP026702881 [AD] 1-15 * abstract * * page 546, column 1, paragraph 6 - column 2, paragraph 3 * * page 547, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jelectrocard.2009.07.007 | [AD] - SCIRICA BENJAMIN M ET AL, "Effect of ranolazine, an antianginal agent with novel electrophysiological properties, on the incidence of Arrhythmias in patients with Non-ST-Segment-Elevation acute coronary syndrome - Thrombolysis in myocardial infarction 36 (MERLIN-TIMI 36) Randomized controlled trial", CIRCULATION, (200710), vol. 116, no. 15, ISSN 0009-7322, pages 1647 - 1652, XP002631256 [AD] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/circulationaha.107.724880 | [A] - GRAMLEY FELIX ET AL, "Recent advances in the pharmacological treatment of cardiac arrythmias.", DRUGS OF TODAY, BARCELONA, SPAIN, (200911), vol. 45, no. 11, ISSN 1699-3993, pages 807 - 824, XP002631257 [A] 1-15 * page 817, column 2, lines 34-35 * | [AD] - BURASHNIKOV ALEXANDER ET AL, "Author Manuscript:Atrial-selective sodium channel block for the treatment of atrial fibrillation.", NIH Public Access, (200906), pages 1 - 25, URL: http://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC2756337/pdf/nihms125373.pdf, (20110405), XP002631258 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * * Published in final edited form as: Expert Opin Emerg Drugs. 2009 June, 14(2). 233-249 * | [AD] - SICOURI S ET AL, "Antiarrhythmic effects of ranolazine in canine pulmonary vein sleeve preparations", HEART RHYTHM, ELSEVIER, US, vol. 5, no. 7, doi:10.1016/J.HRTHM.2008.03.018, ISSN 1547-5271, (200807), pages 1019 - 1026, (20080321), XP022819454 [AD] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.hrthm.2008.03.018 | [AD] - HOHNLOSER STEFAN H ET AL, "Effect of dronedarone on cardiovascular events in atrial fibrillation", NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, MASSACHUSETTS MEDICAL SOCIETY, BOSTON, MA, US, (20090212), vol. 360, no. 7, doi:10.1056/NEJMOA0803778, ISSN 1533-4406, pages 668 - 678, XP002604030 [AD] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa0803778 | by applicant | US3845770 | US4326525 | US4567264 | US4902514 | US5223510 | US5472707 | US5506229 | US5616345 | US6503911 | US6852724 | US6939865 | US7022343 | US2006177502 | US7323493 | - FUSTER ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2006), vol. 114, no. 7, pages E257 - 354 | - ROY ET AL., NENGL JMED, (2008), vol. 358, no. 25, pages 2667 - 2677 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, 17th Edition,, (1985), page 1418 | - SONG ET AL., AM JPHYSIOL, (2008), vol. 294, pages H2031 - 2039 | - SICOURI ET AL., HEART RHYTHM, (2008), vol. 5, pages 1019 - 1026 | - ANTZELEVITCH ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2004), vol. 110, pages 904 - 910 | - BURASHNIKOV ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2007), vol. 116, pages 1449 - 1457 | - KURRIAR ET AL., J CARDIOVASC ELECTROPHYSIOL, (2009), vol. 20, pages 796 - 802 | - KUMAR ET AL., J CARDIOVASC ELECTROPHYSIOL, (2009), vol. 20, pages 796 - 802 | - SONG ET AL., AM J PHYSIOL, (2008), vol. 294, pages H2031 - 2039 | - LI ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2000), vol. 101, pages 2631 - 2638 | - VERHEULE, CIRCULATION, (2003), vol. 107, pages 2615 - 2622 | - KISTLER ET AL., EUR HEART J, (2006), vol. 27, pages 3045 - 3056 | - KIRCHHOF ET AL., J CARDIOVASC. ELECTROPHYSIOL, (2003), vol. 14, pages 1027 - 1033 | - ANTZELE,4TCH ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2004), vol. 110, pages 904 - 910 | - VAN WAGONER D., J CARDIOVASC PHARM, (2008), vol. 52, pages 306 - 313 | - GO AS; HYLEK EM; PHILLIPS KA; CHANG Y; HENAULT LE; SELBY JV; SINGER DE, "Prevalence of diagnosed atrial fibrillation in adults: national implications for rhythm management and stroke prevention: the AnTicoagulation and Risk Factors in Atrial Fibrillation (ATRIA) Study", JAMA, (2001), vol. 285, pages 2370 - 2375 | - ZIMETBAUM PJ, "Dronedarone for atrial fibrillation-an odyssey", NENGL JMED, (2009), vol. 360, doi:doi:10.1056/NEJMp0902248, pages 1811 - 1813, XP055016654 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMp0902248 | - PICCINI JP; HASSELBLAD V; PETERSON ED; WASHAM JB; CALIFF RM; KONG DF, "Comparative efficacy of dronedarone and amiodarone for the maintenance of sinus rhythm in patients with atrial fibrillation", JAM COLL CARDIOL., (2009), vol. 54, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jacc.2009.04.085, pages 1089 - 1095, XP026583351 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jacc.2009.04.085 | - TOUBOUL P; BRUGADA J; CAPUCCI A; CRIJNS HJ; EDVARDSSON N; HOHNLOSER SH, "Dronedarone for prevention of atrial fibrillation: a dose-ranging study", EUR HEART J., (2003), vol. 24, doi:doi:10.1016/S0195-668X(03)00321-X, pages 1481 - 1487, XP007905686 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0195-668X(03)00321-X | - SINGH BN; CONNOLLY SJ; CRIJNS HJ; ROY D; KOWEY PR; CAPUCCI A; RADZIK D; ALIOT EM; HOHNLOSER SH, "Dronedarone for maintenance of sinus rhythm in atrial fibrillation or flutter", N ENGL JMED., (2007), vol. 357, doi:doi:10.1056/NEJMoa054686, pages 987 - 999, XP007905685 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa054686 | - DAVY JM; HEROLD M; HOGLUND C; TIMMERMANS A; ALINGS A; RADZIK D; VAN KL., "Dronedarone for the control of ventricular rate in permanent atrial fibrillation: the Efficacy and safety of dRonedArone for the control of ventricular rate during atrial fibrillation (ERATO) study", AM HEART J., (2008), vol. 156, pages 527.E1 - 527.E9 | - KOBER L; TORP-PEDERSEN C; MCMURRAY JJ; GOTZSCHE 0; LEVY S; CRIJNS H; AMLIE J; CARLSEN J, "Increased mortality after dronedarone therapy for severe heart failure", N ENGL JMED., (2008), vol. 358, doi:doi:10.1056/NEJMoa0800456), pages 2678 - 2687, XP055016653 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa0800456) | - HOHNLOSER SH; CRIJNS HJ; VAN EM; GAUDIN C; PAGE RL; TORP-PEDERSEN C; CONNOLLY SJ, "Effect of dronedarone on cardiovascular events in atrial fibrillation", NENGL JMED., (2009), vol. 360, doi:doi:10.1056/NEJMoa0803778, pages 668 - 678, XP002664648 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa0803778 | - BURASHNIKOV A; DI DIEGO JM; ZYGMUNT AC; BELARDINELLI L; ANTZELEVITCH C, "Atrium-selective sodium channel block as a strategy for suppression of atrial fibrillation: differences in sodium channel inactivation between atria and ventricles and the role of ranolazine", CIRCULATION, (2007), vol. 116, pages 1449 - 1457 | - BURASHNIKOV A; DI DIEGO JM; SICOURI S; FERREIRO M; CARLSSON L; ANTZELEVITCH C, "Atrial-selective effects of chronic amiodarone in the management of atrial fibrillation", HEART RHYTHM., (2008), vol. 5, doi:doi:10.1016/j.hrthm.2008.09.015, pages 1735 - 1742, XP025781327 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.hrthm.2008.09.015 | - SICOURI S; GLASS A; BELARDINELLI L; ANTZELEVITCH C, "Antiarrhythmic effects of ranolazine in canine pulmonary vein sleeve preparations", HEART RHYTHM, (2008), vol. 5, doi:doi:10.1016/j.hrthm.2008.03.018, pages 1019 - 1026, XP022819454 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.hrthm.2008.03.018 | - SICOURI S; BELARDINELLI L; CARLSSON L; ANTZELEVITCH C., "Potent antiarrhythmic effects of chronic amiodarone in canine pulmonary vein sleeve preparations", J CARDIOVASC ELECTROPHYSIOL., (2009), vol. 20, pages 803 - 810 | - KUMAR K; NEARING BD; CARVAS M; NASCIMENTO BC; ACAR M; BELARDINELLI L; VERRIER RL, "Ranolazine exerts potent effects on atrial electrical properties and abbreviates atrial fibrillation duration in the intact porcine heart", J CARDIOVASC ELECTROPHYSIOL., (2009), vol. 20, pages 796 - 802 | - ANTZELEVITCH C; BELARDINELLI L; ZYGMUNT AC; BURASHNIKOV A; DI DIEGO JM; FISH JM; CORDEIRO JM; THOMAS GP, "Electrophysiologic effects of ranolazine: a novel anti-anginal agent with antiarrhythmic properties", CIRCULATION, (2004), vol. 110, pages 904 - 910 | - BURASHNIKOV A; MANNAVA S; ANTZELEVITCH C, "Transmembrane action potential heterogeneity in the canine isolated arterially-perfused atrium: effect of Ikr and Ito/Ikur block", AM JPHYSIOL., (2004), vol. 286, pages H2393 - H2400 | - PATTERSON E; PO SS; SCHERLAG BJ; LAZZARA R, "Triggered firing in pulmonary veins initiated by in vitro autonomic nerve stimulation", HEART RHYTHM, (2005), vol. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/j.hrthm.2005.02.012, pages 624 - 631, XP004931677 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.hrthm.2005.02.012 | - PATTERSON E; LAZZARA R; SZABO B; LIU H; TANG D; LI YH; SCHERLAG BJ; PO SS, "Sodium-calcium exchange initiated by the Ca2+ transient: an arrhythmia trigger within pulmonary veins", JAM COLL CARDIOL., (2006), vol. 47, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jacc.2005.12.023, pages 1196 - 1206, XP029653114 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jacc.2005.12.023 | - CHEN YJ; CHEN SA; CHANG MS; LIN CI, "Arrhythmogenic activity of cardiac muscle in pulmonary veins of the dog: implication for the genesis of atrial fibrillation", CARDIOVASC RES., (2000), vol. 48, pages 265 - 273 | - CHEN YJ; CHEN SA, "Electrophysiology of pulmonary veins", J CARDIOVASC ELECTROPHYSIOL., (2006), vol. 17, pages 220 - 224 | - FUSTER V; RYDEN LE; CANNOM DS; CRIJNS HJ; CURTIS AB; ELLENBOGEN KA; HALPERIN JL; LE HEUZEY JY; KAY GN; LOWE JT, "ACC/AHA/ESC 2006 guidelines for the management of patients with atrial fibrillation--executive summary: a report of the American College of Cardiology/American Heart Association Task Force on Practice Guidelines and the European Society of Cardiology Committee for Practice Guidelines (Writing Commit", JAM COLL CARDIOL., (2006), vol. 48, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jacc.2006.07.009, pages 854 - 906, XP029653177 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jacc.2006.07.009 | - REIFFEL, J. A., "Rate versus rhythm control pharmacotherapy for atrial fibrillation: where are we in 2008?", JOURNAL>, (2008), vol. 1, pages 31 - 47 | - NACCARELLI GV; GONZALEZ MD, "Atrial fibrillation and the expanding role of catheter ablation: do antiarrhythmic drugs have a future?", J CARDIOVASC PHARMACOL., (2008), vol. 52, pages 203 - 209 | - CAIN ME; CURTIS AB, "Rhythm control in atrial fibrillation--one setback after another", N ENGL J MED., (2008), vol. 358, pages 2725 - 2727 | - SAVELIEVA I; CAMM J, "Anti-arrhythmic drug therapy for atrial fibrillation: current anti-arrhythmic drugs, investigational agents, and innovative approaches", EUROPACE, (2008), vol. 10, doi:doi:10.1093/europace/eun130, pages 647 - 665, XP008096587 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/europace/eun130 | - HAISSAGUERRE M; JAIS P; SHAH DC; TAKAHASHI A; HOCINI M; QUINIOU G; GARRIGUE S; LE MOUROUX A; LE METAYER P; CLEMENTY J., "Spontaneous initiation of atrial fibrillation by ectopic beats originating in the pulmonary veins", NENGL JMED, (1998), vol. 339, pages 659 - 666 | - SHAH DC; HAISSAGUERRE M; JAIS P; CLEMENTY J, "High-resolution mapping of tachycardia originating from the superior vena cava: evidence of electrical heterogeneity, slow conduction, and possible circus movement reentry", J CARDIOVASC ELECTROPHYSIOL., (2002), vol. 13, pages 3 8 8 - 3 92 | - NATTEL S; SHIROSHITA-TAKESHITA A; BRUNDEL BJ; RIVARD L, "Mechanisms of atrial fibrillation: lessons from animal models", PROG CARDIOVASC DIS., (2005), vol. 48, doi:doi:10.1016/j.pcad.2005.06.002, pages 9 - 28, XP026039091 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.pcad.2005.06.002 | - ANTZELEVITCH C; BURASHNIKOV A, "Atrial-selective sodium channel block as a novel strategy for the management of atrial fibrillation", J ELECTROCARDIOL., (2009), vol. 42, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jelectrocard.2009.07.007, pages 543 - 548, XP026702881 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jelectrocard.2009.07.007 | - VARRO A; TAKACS J; NEMETH M; HALA 0; VIRAG L; LOST N; BALATI B; AGOSTON M; VERECKEI A; PASTOR G, "Electrophysiological effects of dronedarone (SR 33589), a noniodinated amiodarone derivative in the canine heart: comparison with amiodarone", BR J PHARMACOL, (2001), vol. 133, pages 625 - 634 | - GAUTIER P; GUILLEMARE E; MARION A; BERTRAND JP; TOURNEUR Y; NISATO D, "Electrophysiologic characterization of dronedarone in guinea pig ventricular cells", J CARDIOVASC PHARMACOL., (2003), vol. 41, pages 191 - 202 | - SUN W; SARMA JS; SINGH BN, "Electrophysiological effects of dronedarone (SR33589), a noniodinated benzofuran derivative, in the rabbit heart: comparison with amiodarone", CIRCULATION, (1999), vol. 100, pages 2276 - 2281 | - SUN W; SARMA JS; SINGH BN, "Chronic and acute effects of dronedarone on the action potential of rabbit atrial muscle preparations: comparison with amiodarone", J CARDIOVASC PHARMACOL., (2002), vol. 39, pages 677 - 684 | - MORO S; FERREIRO M; CCLESTINO D; MEDEI E; ELIZARI MV; SICOURI S, "In vitro effects of acute amiodarone and dronedarone on epicardial, endocardial, and M cells of the canine ventricle", J CARDIOVASC PHARMACOL THER, (2007), vol. 12, pages 314 - 321 | - MANNING A; THISSE V; HODEIGE D; RICHARD J; HEYNDRICKX JP; CHATELAIN P, "SR 33589, a new amiodarone-like antiarrhythmic agent: electrophysiological effects in anesthetized dogs", J CARDIOVASC PHARMACOL., (1995), vol. 25, doi:doi:10.1097/00005344-199502000-00010, pages 252 - 261, XP001024497 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00005344-199502000-00010 | - VERDUYN SC; VOS MA; LEUNISSEN HD; VAN OPSTAL JM; WELLENS HJ, "Evaluation of the acute clectrophysiologic effects of intravenous dronedarone, an amiodarone-like agent, with special emphasis on ventricular repolarization and acquired torsade de pointes arrhythmias", J CARDIOVASC PHARMACOL., (1999), vol. 33, doi:doi:10.1097/00005344-199902000-00006, pages 212 - 222, XP001024499 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00005344-199902000-00006 | - FINANCE 0; MANNING A; CHATELAIN P, "Effects of a new amiodarone-like agent, SR 33589, in comparison to amiodarone, D,L-sotalol, and lignocaine, on ischemia-induced ventricular arrhythmias in anesthetized pigs", J CARDIOVASC PHARMACOL., (1995), vol. 26, pages 570 - 576 | - SINGH BN, "Amiodarone as paradigm for developing new drugs for atrial fibrillation", J CARDIOVASC PHARMACOL., (2008), vol. 52, pages 300 - 305 | - SCIRICA BM; MORROW DA; HOD H; MURPHY SA; BELARDINELLI L; HEDGEPETH CM; MOLHOEK P; VERHEUGT FW; GERSH BJ; MCCABE CH, "Effect of ranolazine, an antianginal agent with novel electrophysiological properties, on the incidence of arrhythmias in patients with non ST-segment elevation acute coronary syndrome: results from the Metabolic Efficiency With Ranolazine for Less Ischemia in Non ST-Elevation Acute Coronary Syndrom", CIRCULATION, (2007), vol. 116, doi:doi:10.1161/circulationaha.107.724880, pages 1647 - 1652, XP002631256 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/circulationaha.107.724880 | - MURDOCK DK; OVERTON N; KERSTEN M; KALIEBE J; DEVECCHI F, "The effect of ranolazine on maintaining sinus rhythm in patients with resistant atrial fibrillation", INDIAN PACING ELECTROPHYSIOL J, (2008), vol. 8, pages 175 - 181 | - MURDOCK DK; KERSTEN M; KALIEBE J; LARRIAN G, "The use of oral ranolazine to convert new or paroxysmal atrial fibrillation: a reveiw of experience with implications for possible ''pill in the pocket'' approach to atrial fibrillation", INDIAN PACING ELECTROPHYSIOL J, (2009), vol. 9, pages 260 - 267 | - GOLDSCHLAGER N; EPSTEIN AE; NACCARELLI GV; OLSHANSKY B; SINGH B; COLLARD HR; MURPHY E, "A practical guide for clinicians who treat patients with amiodarone: 2007", HEART RHYTHM., (2007), vol. 4, doi:doi:10.1016/j.hrthm.2007.07.020, pages 1250 - 1259, XP022219201 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.hrthm.2007.07.020 | - BARDY GH; LEE KL; MARK DB; POOLE JE; PACKER DL; BOINEAU R; DOMANSKI M; TROUTMAN C; ANDERSON J; JOHNSON G, "Amiodarone or an implantable cardioverter-defibrillator for congestive heart failure", N ENGL J MED, (2005), vol. 352, pages 225 - 237 | - CONNOLLY SJ; CRIJNS HJ; TORP-PEDERSEN C; VAN EM, GAUDIN C; PAGE RL; HOHNLOSER SH, "Analysis of stroke in ATHENA: a placebo-controlled, double-blind, parallel-arm trial to assess the efficacy of dronedarone 400 mg BID for the prevention of cardiovascular hospitalization or death from any cause in patients with atrial fibrillation/atrial flutter", CIRCULATION, (2009), vol. 120, doi:doi:10.1161/CIRCULATIONAHA.109.875252, pages 1174 - 1180, XP002664647 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/CIRCULATIONAHA.109.875252 | - KOREN MJ; CRAGER MR; SWEENEY M, "Long-term safety of a novel antianginal agent in patients with severe chronic stable angina: the Ranolazine Open Label Experience (ROLE", JAM COLL CARDIOL., (2007), vol. 49, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jacc.2006.10.067, pages 1027 - 1034, XP029654713 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jacc.2006.10.067 | - CHAITMAN BR, "Ranolazine for the treatment of chronic angina and potential use in other cardiovascular conditions", CIRCULATION, (2006), vol. 113, pages 2462 - 2472 | - MALTSEV VA; SABBAH HN; UNDROVINAS AI, "Late sodium current is a novel target for amiodarone: studies in failing human myocardium", J MOL CELL CARDIOL., (2001), vol. 33, pages 923 - 932 | - ANTZELEVITCH C, "Electrical heterogeneity, cardiac arrhythmias, and the sodium channel", CIRC RES., (2000), vol. 87, pages 964 - 965 | - ANTZELEVITCH C; BELARDINELLI L; WU L; FRASER H; ZYGMUNT AC; BURASHNIKOV A; DI DIEGO JM; FISH JM; CORDEIRO JM; GOODROW RJ, "Electrophysiologic properties and antiarrhythmic actions of a novel anti-anginal agent", J CARDIOVASC PHARMACOL THERAPEUT, (2004), vol. 9, no. 1, pages S65 - S83 | - SHRYOCK JC; BELARDINELLI L, "Inhibition of late sodium current to reduce electrical and mechanical dysfunction of ischaemic myocardium", BR J PHARMACOL., (2008), vol. 153, doi:doi:10.1038/SJ.BJP.0707522, pages 1128 - 1132, XP002581022 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/SJ.BJP.0707522 | - BURASHNIKOV A; ANTZELEVITCH C, "Atrial-selective sodium channel block for the treatment of atrial fibrillation", EXPERT OPIN EMERG DRUGS, (2009), vol. 14, pages 233 - 249, XP009140792 | - PAPPONE C; SANTINELLI V; MANGUSO F; VICEDOMINI G; GUGLIOTTA F; AUGELLO G; MAZZONE P; TORTORIELLO V; LANDONI G; ZANGRILLO A, "Pulmonary vein denervation enhances long-term benefit after circumferential ablation for paroxysmal atrial fibrillation", CIRCULATION, (2004), vol. 109, pages 327 - 334 |