EP2792565 - Chair lift seat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LST GmbH Im Farchet 17 83646 Bad Tölz / DE | [2015/51] |
Former [2014/43] | For all designated states LST Ropeway Systems GmbH An der Bretonenbrücke 8 83661 Lenggries / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Glasl, Peter Valtl 6 83646 Wackersberg / DE | [2014/43] | Representative(s) | Beckord & Niedlich Patentanwälte PartG mbB Marktplatz 17 83607 Holzkirchen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/43] | Beckord & Niedlich Marktplatz 17 83607 Holzkirchen / DE | Application number, filing date | 14162409.8 | 28.03.2014 | [2014/43] | Priority number, date | DE201310103550 | 09.04.2013 Original published format: DE102013103550 | [2014/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2792565 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B61B12/00 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
B61B12/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/19] |
Former [2014/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Sesselliftsitz | [2014/43] | English: | Chair lift seat | [2014/43] | French: | Siège de télésiège | [2014/43] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/19] | 01.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/10] | 31.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]AT385961B (FELIX WOPFNER STAHL & MASCHINE [AT]) [XD] 1-7,9-11 * the whole document *; | [A]CH543991 (JOERG & SOHN FA W [CH]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]DE202011003078U (INNOVA PATENT GMBH [AT]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]CH704867 (BARTHOLET MASCHB AG [CH]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2012172198 (POMAGALSKI SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | by applicant | AT385961B |