EP2787585 - Cable connection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agro AG Korbackerweg 7 5502 Hunzenschwil / CH | [2014/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rettig, Hans Jörg Bahnhofstrasse 7c 5502 Hunzenschwil / CH | [2014/41] | Representative(s) | Rentsch Partner AG Kirchenweg 8 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/41] | Rentsch Partner AG Rechtsanwälte und Patentanwälte Fraumünsterstrasse 9 Postfach 2441 8022 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 14162419.7 | 28.03.2014 | [2014/41] | Priority number, date | CH20130000727 | 05.04.2013 Original published format: CH 7272013 | [2014/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2787585 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2787585 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/06, H02G3/08, H02G15/04 | [2015/02] | CPC: |
H02G3/0675 (EP);
H02G3/083 (EP);
H02G15/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/41] | H02G3/06, H02G3/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/33] |
Former [2014/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kabelverschraubung | [2014/41] | English: | Cable connection | [2014/41] | French: | Dispositif de fixation de câble | [2014/41] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/33] | 19.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/14] | 24.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.07.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE29712576U (S I B A D R [FR]) [X] 1-3,12,16 * abstract *[I] 4-11,13-15; | [I]DE202004000091U (WISKA HOPPMANN & MULSOW GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-16 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0011] *; | [X]DE102006062609 (HIDDE AXEL R [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,12,16 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0049] *; | [XI]DE202010006985U (AVC IND CORP [TW]) [X] 1-5,12 * the whole document * [I] 6-11,13-16; | [XI]US2012037416 (CHIOU JIUN WEI [TW]) [X] 1-3,5,12,16 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0032] * [I] 4,6,7,11,14,15 | by applicant | WO9418734 | DE102010031345 |