EP2786825 - Wire electric discharge machine having wire electrode tension control function [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC CORPORATION 3580 Shibokusa Aza-Komanba Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | [2014/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KASAI, Hirotsugu c/o FANUC CORPORATION 3580, Shibokusa Aza-komanba, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | [2014/41] | Representative(s) | Ward, James Norman Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/41] | Ward, James Norman Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 14163098.8 | 01.04.2014 | [2014/41] | Priority number, date | JP20130076859 | 02.04.2013 Original published format: JP 2013076859 | [2014/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2786825 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2786825 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B23H7/06, B23H7/10 | [2014/41] | CPC: |
B23H7/065 (EP,US);
B23H1/00 (US);
B23H7/104 (EP,US);
B23H7/06 (EP,US);
B23H7/10 (US);
G05B2219/45221 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Elektrische Drahterodiermaschine mit Elektrodenspannungssteuerungsfunktion | [2014/41] | English: | Wire electric discharge machine having wire electrode tension control function | [2014/41] | French: | Machine de décharge électrique à coupe-pâte disposant d'une fonction de contrôle de tension de câble | [2014/41] | Examination procedure | 01.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/41] | 18.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/50] | 24.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4801779 (OBARA HARUKI [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0667203 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [A] 1* column 4, lines 20-26 *; | [A]EP0686452 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3 * column 2, lines 3-11 * * column 3, lines 3-15P * | by applicant | JPH05312657 | JPH10309631 | JPH11254240 |