EP2814270 - Multimedia messaging method and system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.2015 [2015/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Core Wireless Licensing S.à.r.l. 16 Avenue Pasteur 2310 Luxembourg / LU | [2014/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mostafa, Miraj Laattapolku 3 B 21 33720 Tampere / FI | [2014/51] | Representative(s) | Espatent Oy Kaivokatu 10 D 00100 Helsinki / FI | [2014/51] | Application number, filing date | 14163112.7 | 08.02.2002 | [2014/51] | Priority number, date | FI20010000238 | 08.02.2001 Original published format: FI 20010238 | [2014/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2814270 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/12 | [2014/51] | CPC: |
H04L51/10 (EP,US);
H04L51/063 (EP,US);
H04L65/1069 (EP,US);
H04L65/1101 (US);
H04L65/1104 (EP,US);
H04L65/612 (EP,US);
H04L65/65 (EP,US);
H04L65/765 (EP,US);
H04L67/02 (EP,US);
H04L67/04 (EP,US);
H04L67/142 (EP,US);
H04N21/6131 (EP,US);
H04W4/12 (EP,US);
H04L51/04 (EP,US);
H04L51/42 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2014/51] | Title | German: | Multimedia-Benachrichtigungsverfahren und System | [2014/51] | English: | Multimedia messaging method and system | [2014/51] | French: | Système et procédé de messagerie multimédia | [2014/51] | Examination procedure | 02.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/51] | 18.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/52] | 24.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/52] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02722624.0 / EP1360819 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0016541 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 35, line 19 * * figures 1-13 *; | [ID] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Terminals; Multimedia Messaging Service (MMS); Functional description; Stage 2 (Release 4)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 23.140, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20001201), no. V4.1.0, pages 1 - 46, XP050362801 [ID] 1-15 * abstract * * section 1-8 * |