EP2811598 - Electric/electronic installation apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.2017 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Berker GmbH & Co. KG Klagebach 38 58579 Schalksmühle / DE | [2014/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Richter, Michael Berker GmbH & Co. KG Harrenscheid 7c 58579 Schalksmühle / DE | [2014/50] | Representative(s) | Nuss, Laurent, et al Laurent Nuss Conseil 12, rue Theophile Schuler 67000 Strasbourg / FR | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 14163118.4 | 02.04.2014 | [2014/50] | Priority number, date | DE201310105893 | 07.06.2013 Original published format: DE102013105893 | [2014/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2811598 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/12 | [2014/50] | CPC: |
H02G3/128 (EP);
H02G3/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/29] |
Former [2014/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Elektrisches/elektronisches Installationsgerät | [2014/50] | English: | Electric/electronic installation apparatus | [2014/50] | French: | Appareil d'installation électrique/électronique | [2014/50] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/29] | 10.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/51] | 17.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2552085 (ABB AG [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0016]; figure - *; | [AD]DE202008015052U (BERKER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [AD] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US5342993 (SIEMS STEVEN L [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE202008015052U |