EP2799550 - Caustic stable chromatography ligands [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMD Millipore Corporation 290 Concord Road Billerica, MA 01821 / US | [2014/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bian, Nanying c/o EMD Millipore Corporation 290 Concord Road Billerica, MA 01821 / US | 02 /
Soice, Neil c/o EMD Millipore Corporation 290 Concord Road Billerica, MA 01821 / US | 03 /
Spector, Shari c/o EMD Millipore Corporation 290 Concord Road Billerica, MA 01821 / US | 04 /
Levine, Kara c/o EMD Millipore Corporation 290 Concord Road Billerica, MA 01821 / US | [2014/45] | Representative(s) | Kirkham, Nicholas Andrew, et al Graham Watt & Co. LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [2014/45] | Application number, filing date | 14163423.8 | 23.12.2009 | [2014/45] | Priority number, date | US20080203664P | 24.12.2008 Original published format: US 203664 P | [2014/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2799550 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2799550 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/31, C07K14/31, B01D15/38, B01J20/286 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
C07K14/31 (EP,CN,US);
B01D15/3809 (EP,US);
B01J20/286 (EP,US);
B01J20/3244 (EP,US);
B01J20/3274 (EP,US);
C07K1/22 (CN);
C07K16/00 (CN);
G01N30/50 (CN);
G01N33/566 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/25] |
Former [2014/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Kaustisch stabile Chromatografie-Liganden | [2014/45] | English: | Caustic stable chromatography ligands | [2014/45] | French: | Ligands de chromatographie stables caustiques | [2014/45] | Examination procedure | 05.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/25] | 15.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09180615.8 / EP2202310 | EP12171108.9 / EP2518151 | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.12.2009 | CY | 01.03.2017 | CZ | 01.03.2017 | DK | 01.03.2017 | EE | 01.03.2017 | FI | 01.03.2017 | HR | 01.03.2017 | LT | 01.03.2017 | LV | 01.03.2017 | MC | 01.03.2017 | MK | 01.03.2017 | PL | 01.03.2017 | RO | 01.03.2017 | SI | 01.03.2017 | SK | 01.03.2017 | SM | 01.03.2017 | TR | 01.03.2017 | BG | 01.06.2017 | NO | 01.06.2017 | GR | 02.06.2017 | IS | 01.07.2017 | PT | 03.07.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/52] | HU | 23.12.2009 | |
CY | 01.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
MK | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 23.12.2009 | |
CY | 01.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 23.12.2009 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
SM | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 01.03.2017 | |
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 01.03.2017 | |
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2006304633 ; | [A]EP0230869 (KABIGEN AB [SE]) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-8 *; | [A]EP0550771 (ORIENTAL YEAST CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0023580 (AFFIBODY TECHNOLOGY SWEDEN AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0069457 (UNIV CALIFORNIA SAN DIEGO [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO03080655 (AMERSHAM BIOSCIENCES AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006134805 (BERG HANS [SE], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006092338 (AFFIBODY AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [AD]WO2008039141 (GE HEALTHCARE BIO SCIENCES AB [SE], et al) [AD] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [E]EP2157099 (MILLIPORE CORP [US]) [E] 1 * the whole document *; | [A] - HOBER SOPHIA ET AL, "Protein A chromatography for antibody purification", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY B: BIOMEDICAL SCIENCES & APPLICATIONS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.JCHROMB.2006.09.030, vol. 848, no. 1, ISSN 1570-0232, (20070315), pages 40 - 47, (20061009), XP002560075 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jchromb.2006.09.030 | [A] - NILSSON B ET AL, "A synthetic IgG-binding domain based on staphylococcal protein A", PROTEIN ENGINEERING, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (19870101), vol. 1, no. 2, ISSN 0269-2139, pages 107 - 113, XP002133892 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - JANSSON B ET AL, "All individual domains of staphylococcal protein A show Fab binding", FEMS IMMUNOLOGY AND MEDICAL MICROBIOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S0928-8244(97)00108-9, (19980101), vol. 20, no. 1, ISSN 0928-8244, pages 69 - 78, XP002284946 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0928-8244(97)00108-9 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2007, no. 02, Database accession no. 2007-012290, XP002683879 & JP2006304633 A 20061109 (APRO SCI KK) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | by applicant | US4879378 | US5151350 | US5198531 | US5240680 | US6060596 | US6399750 | US6831161 | US2007207500 | WO2008039141 | US2008108053 | WO2008091740 | US2008255027 | - SJODHAL, EUR J BIOCHEM., (197709), vol. 78, no. 2, pages 471 - 90 | - UHLEN ET AL., J BIOL CHEM., (198402), vol. 259, no. 3, pages 1695 - 702 | - NILSSON ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1987), vol. 1, no. 2, pages 107 - 113 | - SMITH; WATERMAN, ADV. APPL, MATH., (1981), vol. 2, page 482 | - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, page 443 | - PEARSON; LIPMAN, PROC. NAT'L. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, page 2444 | - AUSUBEL ET AL., CURRENT PROTOCOLS IN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, page 403 | - HENIKOFF; HENIKOFF, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 89, page 10915 | - NILSSON ET AL., PROTEIN ENGNG., (1997), vol. 1, pages 107 - 113 | - HJERTEN, BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (1964), vol. 79, no. 2, pages 393 - 398 | - ARSHADY, CHIMICA E L'INDUSTRIA, (1988), vol. 70, no. 9, pages 70 - 75 | - HERMANSON ET AL., Immobilized Affinity Ligand Techniques, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1992), pages 51 - 136 | - LJUNGQUIST ET AL., EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1989), vol. 186, pages 558 - 561 | - Process Scale Bioseparations for the Biopharmaceutical Industry, CRC PRESS, (2006), page 473 | - PORATH; FORNSTEDT, J. CHROMATOGRAPHY, (1979), vol. 51, page 479 |