EP2797065 - Method and system for voice information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.04.2018 [2018/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JCDecaux SA 17, rue Soyer 92200 Neuilly-Sur-Seine / FR | [2014/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paquin, Benoît 7 rue de la Paroisse 78000 Versailles / FR | 02 /
Uung, Hang 12, rue Vineuse 75116 Paris / FR | [2014/44] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 14163987.2 | 09.04.2014 | [2014/44] | Priority number, date | FR20130053889 | 26.04.2013 Original published format: FR 1353889 | [2014/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2797065 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/123, H04M1/725, G09B21/00, A61H3/06 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
A61H3/061 (EP);
E04H1/1211 (EP);
G08G1/123 (EP);
G09B21/006 (EP);
H04M1/72481 (EP);
H04M1/737 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] |
Former [2014/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Sprachinformationsverfahren und -system | [2014/44] | English: | Method and system for voice information | [2014/44] | French: | Procédé et système d'information vocale | [2014/44] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/24] | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/16] | 01.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]GB2393599 (HUSSAIN SALEH ALI [GB]) [Y] 6 * page 2, line 15 - page 3, line 22; figure 1 * * sentences 1-27, paragraph 5 * * page 7, lines 8-21 * [A] 1,8; | [XYI]DE10339598 (PROTSCHKA HANS [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8 * the whole document * [Y] 6 [I] 3; | [AD]FR2880459 (JCDECAUX SA [FR]) [AD] 1-8* the whole document *; | [I]JP2007233937 (DOSHISHA, et al) [I] 1,8 * abstract * * traduction automatique en anglais, paragraphes 34-38 & 46 *; | [A]GB2470897 (YOUSAFZAI RABNAWAZ [GB]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0009] , [0010] , [0015] , [0016] , [0023] , [0 26]; figures 1-2; claim 4 *; | [I]WO2012056479 (MOLINARI ROBERTO [IT]) [I] 1,2,4,5,8 * page 2, lines 21-24 * * page 3, lines 14-24 * * page 4, line 10 - page 5, line 7 * * page 6, line 28 - page 7, line 10 * * page 8, lines 10-14 * * page 8, line 25 - page 9, line 2 * | by applicant | FR2880459 |