EP2767580 - Composition for the protection of glassware in a dishwashing process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reckitt Benckiser Finish B.V. Siriusdreef 14 2132 WT Hoofddorp / NL | [2016/04] |
Former [2014/34] | For all designated states Reckitt Benckiser N.V. Siriusdreef 14 2132 WT Hoofddorp / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hahn, Karlheinz Ulrich Gerhard Reckitt Benckiser Produktions GmbH Benckiserplatz 1 67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2014/34] | Representative(s) | Hewett, Erica Louise, et al Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull, East Yorkshire HU8 7DS / GB | [2014/34] | Application number, filing date | 14164168.8 | 19.05.2004 | [2014/34] | Priority number, date | GB20030012143 | 28.05.2003 Original published format: GB 0312143 | [2014/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2767580 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2767580 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2767580 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/02, C11D3/12 | [2014/34] | CPC: |
C11D3/046 (EP,US);
C11D3/0073 (EP,US);
C11D3/1206 (EP,US);
C11D3/1213 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/24] |
Former [2014/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung zum Schutz von Glasware in einem Geschirrspülvorgang | [2014/34] | English: | Composition for the protection of glassware in a dishwashing process | [2014/34] | French: | Composition pour la protection des verreries dans un processus de lave-vaisselle | [2014/34] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/24] | 03.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04733853.8 / EP1627034 | EP08075274.4 / EP1961803 | EP10158269.0 / EP2194115 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.05.2004 | AT | 21.03.2018 | CY | 21.03.2018 | CZ | 21.03.2018 | DK | 21.03.2018 | EE | 21.03.2018 | FI | 21.03.2018 | MC | 21.03.2018 | RO | 21.03.2018 | SI | 21.03.2018 | SK | 21.03.2018 | IE | 19.05.2018 | LU | 19.05.2018 | BG | 21.06.2018 | GR | 22.06.2018 | PT | 23.07.2018 | [2020/28] |
Former [2019/26] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
IE | 19.05.2018 | ||
LU | 19.05.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
IE | 19.05.2018 | ||
LU | 19.05.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
LU | 19.05.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/06] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
FI | 21.03.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2425907 (BACON LESLIE R. ET AL) [A] 1,10 * column 1, line 1 - line 15; claim 1 *; | [A]GB1586067 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [A] 1-10 * page 1, line 28 - line 35; examples I,V-XV; claim - *; | [A]EP0070587 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-13 * page 2, line 10 - page 3, line 20; example -; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0075986 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1-13* page 7, line 10 - line 27; claim - *; | [AD]EP0383482 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [AD] 1-10 * page 2, lines 1-5; claim - *; | [AD]GB2372500 (RECKITT BENCKISER NV [NL]) [AD] 1-10 * claim - *; | [X] - "Corrosion primer-transformer", DERWENT, (20010520), XP002316822 [X] 12 * the whole document * | by applicant | US3255117 | US3677820 | BE860180 | EP0383480 | EP0383482 | EP0387997 | WO0039259 | WO0164823 | GB2372500 |