EP2757132 - Light-diffusing films and their use in flat screens [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2015/45] |
Former [2014/30] | For all designated states Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Str. 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pudleiner, Heinz Bethelstrasse 39 47800 Krefeld / DE | 02 /
Meyer, Klaus Kamillenstrasse 40 41539 Dormagen / DE | 03 /
Nickel, Joerg Krokusweg 2 41539 Dormagen / DE | [2014/30] | Representative(s) | Levpat c/o Covestro AG Gebäude 4825 51365 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/35] | Levpat c/o Covestro AG Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2014/30] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 14164367.6 | 11.10.2006 | [2014/30] | Priority number, date | DE20051050072 | 19.10.2005 Original published format: DE102005050072 | [2014/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2757132 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2757132 | Date: | 31.08.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C08L69/00, G02B5/02, G02F1/00 | [2014/30] | CPC: |
G02B5/0278 (EP,US);
C08J5/18 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/36 (EP,US);
C08K7/16 (KR);
C08L69/00 (EP,KR,US);
G02B5/02 (KR);
G02B5/0242 (EP,US);
C08J2369/00 (EP,US);
C08L51/04 (EP,US);
G02F1/133606 (EP,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/254 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L69/00, C08L2666/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/35] |
Former [2014/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Lichtstreuende Folien sowie deren Verwendung in Flachbildschirmen | [2014/30] | English: | Light-diffusing films and their use in flat screens | [2014/30] | French: | Films luminescents et leur utilisation dans des écrans plats | [2014/30] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/10] | 16.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06792414.2 / EP1940956 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 11.04.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.10.2014 | 11.04.2014 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   13.10.2014 | 11.04.2014 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   13.10.2014 | 11.04.2014 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   13.10.2014 | 11.04.2014 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   13.10.2014 | 11.04.2014 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   13.10.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.10.2006 | CY | 31.08.2016 | DK | 31.08.2016 | EE | 31.08.2016 | ES | 31.08.2016 | FI | 31.08.2016 | IS | 31.08.2016 | IT | 31.08.2016 | LT | 31.08.2016 | LV | 31.08.2016 | MC | 31.08.2016 | NL | 31.08.2016 | RO | 31.08.2016 | SE | 31.08.2016 | SI | 31.08.2016 | TR | 31.08.2016 | AT | 11.10.2016 | IE | 11.10.2016 | LU | 11.10.2016 | BE | 31.10.2016 | CH | 31.10.2016 | LI | 31.10.2016 | FR | 02.11.2016 | BG | 30.11.2016 | GB | 30.11.2016 | GR | 01.12.2016 | PT | 02.01.2017 | [2018/45] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 11.10.2006 | |
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
IS | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
AT | 11.10.2016 | ||
IE | 11.10.2016 | ||
LU | 11.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
GB | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 11.10.2006 | |
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
AT | 11.10.2016 | ||
IE | 11.10.2016 | ||
LU | 11.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
GB | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | DK | 31.08.2016 | |
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
AT | 11.10.2016 | ||
IE | 11.10.2016 | ||
LU | 11.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
GB | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | DK | 31.08.2016 | |
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
IE | 11.10.2016 | ||
LU | 11.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
GB | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | DK | 31.08.2016 | |
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
LU | 11.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | DK | 31.08.2016 | |
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | DK | 31.08.2016 | |
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 31.08.2016 | |
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | ES | 31.08.2016 | |
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 31.08.2016 | |
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 31.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0342283 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [Y] 1-5* page 27 *; | [YD]US2004066645 (GRAF JOHN [US], et al) [YD] 1-5 * paragraph [0028]; claims 1,8,10,13 * | Examination | WO2005022245 | by applicant | US2991273 | US2999835 | US2999846 | US3148172 | US3189662 | US3271367 | US3419634 | FR1561518 | US3494885 | DE1570703 | DE1495626 | DE2036052 | DE2063050 | DE2232977 | DE2211956 | US3793402 | US3808180 | US3821325 | US3832419 | US4226752 | EP0026120 | EP0026121 | EP0026684 | DE2940024 | EP0028030 | DE3007934 | EP0039845 | US4368240 | DE3228002 | EP0079075 | US4386186 | EP0091602 | EP0097970 | EP0110221 | EP0110238 | DE3334782 | EP0146887 | EP0156103 | US4661580 | US4680371 | US4680372 | EP0234913 | EP0240301 | EP0269324 | DE3832396 | US4982014 | EP0500496 | EP0517044 | EP0269324 | EP0634445 | JPH0790167 | EP0634445 | WO0026275 | WO0105866 | WO0105867 | US2004066645 | WO2004090587 | - H. SCHNELL, Chemistry and Physics of Polycarbonates, Polymer Reviews, INTERSCIENCE PUBLISHERS, (1964), vol. 9, page 33 FF | - "Condensation Polymers by Interfacial and Solution Methods", PAUL W. MORGAN, Polymer Reviews, INTERSCIENCE PUBLISHERS, (1965), vol. 10, page 325 | - "Polycarbonate", DRES. U. GRIGO; K. KIRCHER; P. R- MÜLLER, Becker/Braun, Kunststoff-Handbuch, CARL HANSER VERLAG, (1992), vol. 3/1, pages 118 - 145 | - H. SCHNELL, Chemistry and Physics of Polycarbonates, INTERSCIENCE PUBLISHERS, (1964), page 28FF,102 | - D.G. LEGRAND; J.T. BENDLER, Handbook of Polycarbonate Science and Technology, MARCEL DEKKER, (2000), page 72FF | - H. SCHNELL, Chemistry and Physics of Polycarbonates Polymer Rev., INTERSCIENCE PUBLISHERS, (1964), vol. IX, page 27 FF |