EP2810583 - Head for an oral care implement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.04.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2023 | Change: Date of oral proceedings | 01.09.2023 | Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2014/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jungnickel, Uwe P&G Manufacturing GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg/Taunus / DE | 02 /
Hübner, Marlis P&G Manufacturing GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg/Taunus / DE | 03 /
Ballmaier, Kathi P&G Manufacturing GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg/Taunus / DE | 04 /
Wasow, Sören P&G Manufacturing GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg/Taunus / DE | 05 /
Harrington, Fiona P&G Service GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg/Taunus / DE | [2014/50] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/21] | Töpert, Verena Clarita Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2014/50] | Töpert, Verena Clarita Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Patent Department Frankfurter Str. 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 14164382.5 | 11.04.2014 | [2014/50] | Priority number, date | EP20130170759 | 06.06.2013 Original published format: EP 13170759 | EP20130170761 | 06.06.2013 Original published format: EP 13170761 | EP20130170764 | 06.06.2013 Original published format: EP 13170764 | [2014/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2810583 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2810583 | Date: | 23.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A46D1/00 | [2017/51] | CPC: |
A46B9/04 (EP,US);
A46B9/025 (EP,US);
A46B9/028 (EP,US);
A46B9/06 (EP,US);
A46D1/02 (US);
A46B2200/1066 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/50] | A46B9/02, A46B9/04, A46B9/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/29] |
Former [2014/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Kopf für ein Mundpflegehilfsmittel | [2014/50] | English: | Head for an oral care implement | [2014/50] | French: | Tête pour un instrument de soin buccal | [2014/50] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/29] | 15.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.02.2019
ADMISSIBLE Trisa Holding AG Kantonsstrasse 31 6234 Triengen / CH Opponent's representative Daub, Thomas Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub Bahnhofstrasse 5 88662 Überlingen / DE | 02
22.02.2019
ADMISSIBLE Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York NY 10022-7499 / US Opponent's representative Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.02.2019
ADMISSIBLE Trisa Holding AG Kantonsstrasse 31 6234 Triengen / CH Opponent's representative Daub, Thomas Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub Bahnhofstrasse 5 88662 Überlingen / DE | ||
02
22.02.2019
ADMISSIBLE Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York NY 10022-7499 / US Opponent's representative Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | 13.03.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.07.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.09.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.12.2020 | 05.10.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.09.2021 | 15.12.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.09.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.09.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.11.2021 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 30.11.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 10.02.2022 | Appeal received No. T0360/22 | 10.02.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 11.04.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.10.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.04.2014 | AL | 23.05.2018 | CY | 23.05.2018 | CZ | 23.05.2018 | DK | 23.05.2018 | EE | 23.05.2018 | FI | 23.05.2018 | HR | 23.05.2018 | LT | 23.05.2018 | LV | 23.05.2018 | MC | 23.05.2018 | MK | 23.05.2018 | MT | 23.05.2018 | RO | 23.05.2018 | RS | 23.05.2018 | SI | 23.05.2018 | SK | 23.05.2018 | SM | 23.05.2018 | TR | 23.05.2018 | BG | 23.08.2018 | NO | 23.08.2018 | GR | 24.08.2018 | IS | 23.09.2018 | PT | 24.09.2018 | IE | 11.04.2019 | LU | 11.04.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 11.04.2014 | |
AL | 23.05.2018 | ||
CY | 23.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
MT | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IS | 23.09.2018 | ||
PT | 24.09.2018 | ||
IE | 11.04.2019 | ||
LU | 11.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 11.04.2014 | |
AL | 23.05.2018 | ||
CY | 23.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IS | 23.09.2018 | ||
PT | 24.09.2018 | ||
IE | 11.04.2019 | ||
LU | 11.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
CY | 23.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IS | 23.09.2018 | ||
PT | 24.09.2018 | ||
IE | 11.04.2019 | ||
LU | 11.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
CY | 23.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
PT | 24.09.2018 | ||
IE | 11.04.2019 | ||
LU | 11.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
PT | 24.09.2018 | ||
IE | 11.04.2019 | ||
LU | 11.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 11.04.2019 | ||
LU | 11.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
LU | 11.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
LU | 11.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 23.05.2018 | |
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 23.05.2018 | |
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 23.05.2018 | |
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | FI | 23.05.2018 | |
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 23.05.2018 | |
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO0051462 (CORONET WERKE GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 4 * page 7, lines 2-6, 26-30; figures 19, 22 *[A] 1-3,5-14; | [XY]WO2012022431 (TRISA HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-3,5-14 * page 1, lines 1-4, 28-33, 45-49 * * page 8, lines 30-31 * * page 13, lines 10-23 * * page 42, lines 17-32 * * page 43, lines 1-3 * * page 45, lines 3-12 * * page 59, lines 21-23; figures 7a-7c, 8a-8c, 9a-9c, 10b, 10c, 10e, 21b; claims 8, 9 * * page 17, lines 24-30 * * page 12, lines 8-17 * [Y] 4 | Opposition | US3103679 | DE3528596 | DE29600139U | EP0716821 | US5535474 | US5799353 | US5926897 | WO0051462 | DE19931156 | JP2001218623 | US6363565 | DE20213083U | US2006037161 | US2006186725 | CA2649825 | WO2007134026 | WO2010069919 | US2011030160 | DE102010014928 | WO2012022431 | JP2013052110 | WO2013133848 | US2488873 | DE1938937 | DE3528596 | US5249327 | WO9616571 | DE10046536 | US6546586 | DE19832436 | WO2009000903 | DE202008016004U | DE102010014929 | - Fotos: Zahoransky Zahnbürste (Beweisstück) Anlage 27 | - ZAHORANSKY GROUP, "Team Technologies INC. USA", Contact, (20110200), pages 8 - 9, XP055576887 | - ZAHORANSKY GROUP, "SPECIAL INTERBRUSH 2012", Contact - The Customer Magazine of the ZAHORANSKY GROUP, (20120100), pages 1 - 7, XP055576885 | - ZAHORANSKY AG, "Hygienischer Produktionsprozess bei der Herstellung von Zahnbiirsten ohne Metallanker", Zeitschrift 'BrushScene, (20101100), page 14, XP055576883 | - Rothlaender & Co, "LEADING TOOTHBRUSH MANUFACTUR- ER JIANGSU 5A GROUP GOES FOR ZAHORANSKY ANCHORLESS TECHNOLOGY", Zeitschrift Brushwork, (20120000), page 4, 6, XP055576881 |