EP2933435 - Turbine blade and corresponding turbine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.11.2016 [2016/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2015/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ahmad, Fathi Moselstr. 1 41564 Kaarst / DE | 02 /
Buchholz, Björn Steinknappen 81 45470 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE | 03 /
Koch, Daniela Emmastrasse 39 a 45130 Essen / DE | 04 /
Schüler, Marco Josephinenstr. 41 45131 Essen / DE | [2015/43] | Application number, filing date | 14164723.0 | 15.04.2014 | [2015/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2933435 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/18 | [2015/43] | CPC: |
F01D5/188 (EP);
F05D2250/71 (EP);
F05D2250/711 (EP);
F05D2250/712 (EP);
F05D2260/941 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Turbinenschaufel und zugehörige Turbine | [2015/43] | English: | Turbine blade and corresponding turbine | [2015/43] | French: | Aube de turbine et turbine associée | [2015/43] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/47] | 06.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2013139926 (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH]) [X] 1-3,5-7,9,11,12 * page 7, line 27 - page 10, line 5; figures 1, 2, 4b-4d * * page 13, line 32 - page 14, line 10 * [Y] 8,10; | [X]US4257734 (GUY KENNETH R, et al) [X] 1-6,11,12 * page 10, line 1 - line 2; figures 1, 3, 5 * * page 11, line 1 - line 10 * * page 14, line 15 - line 19 *; | [Y]EP1944467 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [Y] 8,10 * figures 2, 3, 5b *; | [Y]EP1630353 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [Y] 8,10 * page 3, paragraph 11; figure 2 * |