EP2805683 - Electrode assembly for catheter system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states St. Jude Medical, Cardiology Division, Inc. 177 East County Road B St. Paul MN 55117-9913 / US | [2014/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Raatikka, Amy Rochelle 13900 53rd Ave. N., No 1 Plymouth, MN Minnesota 55446 / US | 02 /
Belk, Paul Aaron 7759 Kingsview Ln Maple Grove, MN Minnesota 55331 / US | 03 /
Cajamarca, Manuel Tobias 15710 Rockford Rd. No 107 Plymouth, MN Minnesota 55446 / US | [2014/48] | Representative(s) | Forrest, Stuart, et al WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/48] | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen, et al WP Thompson 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14165506.8 | 22.04.2014 | [2014/48] | Priority number, date | US201361825793P | 21.05.2013 Original published format: US 201361825793 P | [2014/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2805683 | Date: | 26.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2805683 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14, A61B18/00 | [2014/49] | CPC: |
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00214 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00267 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1435 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1467 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/45] |
Former [2014/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Elektrodenanordnung für Kathetersystem | [2014/48] | English: | Electrode assembly for catheter system | [2014/48] | French: | Ensemble d'électrode pour système de cathéter | [2014/48] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/45] | 01.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/15] | 29.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0001313 (VNUS MED TECH INC [US]) [X] 1,4,5 * figures 1,2,5,8,10 *; | [A]WO9717892 (CARDIAC PATHWAYS CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4,5 * page 12, line 11 - line 14; figures 16-19 *; | [X]US7200445 (DALBEC TIM R [US], et al) [X] 1,5 * column 9, line 16 - line 24; figures 2a,4a-4e *; | [X]US2011306851 (WANG JIE [US]) [X] 1,4 * figure 2e *; | [X]US5860974 (ABELE JOHN E [US]) [X] 1 * figures 12-15 *; | [X]WO03089997 (BARD INC C R [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5 * figure 26 *; | [XP]WO2013163322 (CIBIEM INC [US]) [XP] 1,5 * paragraph [0268]; figures 51a,51b *; | [E]WO2014110579 (BOSTON SCIENT SCIMED INC [US]) [E] 1,4,5 * page 16, line 11 - line 24; figure 7 *; | [E]WO2014137889 (ST JUDE MEDICAL ATRIAL FIBRILL [US]) [E] 1,2 * paragraph [0035]; figure 6 *; | [XP]WO2013163411 (VOLCANO CORP [US]) [XP] 1,2,4,5 * page 50, line 1 - page 51, line 7; figure 19 *; | [E]WO2014152038 (MEDTRONIC ARDIAN LUXEMBOURG [US]) [E] 1,2 * figure 3b * |