EP2937660 - Turbulator for use in a cooling channel and heat transfer element with such a turbulator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.11.2016 [2016/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2015/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoffmann, Ingolf Karl-Bröger-Str. 33 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [2015/44] | Application number, filing date | 14165808.8 | 24.04.2014 | [2015/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2937660 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F28F13/06, F28F13/12 | [2015/44] | CPC: |
F28F13/06 (EP);
F28F13/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Turbulator zum Einsatz in einem Kühlmittelkanal und Wärmeübertragungselement mit einem derartigen Turbulator | [2015/44] | English: | Turbulator for use in a cooling channel and heat transfer element with such a turbulator | [2015/44] | French: | Turbulateur destiné à l'utilisation dans un canal de réfrigérant et élément de transfert thermique doté d'un tel turbulateur | [2015/44] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/47] | 09.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2012192812 (RAHMANI RAMIN K [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-9 * paragraph [0016]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0017] * [I] 4; | [X]DE102012208742 (MAHLE INT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,8,9 * figure 2 *; | [A]US6301109 (CHU RICHARD C [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * |