EP2799155 - Method for generating of seamless high gloss surfaces as well as objects with such a surface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Klebchemie M.G. Becker GmbH & Co. KG Max-Becker-Strasse 4 76356 Weingarten/Baden / DE | [2014/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Becker-Weimann, Klaus Gunzenbachstr. 17 76530 Baden-Baden / DE | 02 /
Fandrey, Jens Walter-Stößer-Weg 10 75180 Pforzheim / DE | [2014/45] | Representative(s) | Büchel, Edwin Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstraße 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Büchel, Edwin Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Patentanwälte Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstraße 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 14166176.9 | 28.04.2014 | [2014/45] | Priority number, date | DE201310208159 | 03.05.2013 Original published format: DE102013208159 | [2014/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2799155 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2799155 | Date: | 28.02.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B05D5/06, B05D3/06, B05D7/00, B05D3/12, B05D1/28, B05D1/40, B05D7/06, B05D1/30 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
B05D5/061 (EP);
B05D1/28 (EP);
B05D1/305 (EP);
B05D1/40 (EP);
B05D2503/00 (EP);
B05D3/067 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] |
Former [2014/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erzeugung von fugenlosen Hochglanzoberflächen sowie Gegenstände mit einer solchen Oberfläche | [2014/45] | English: | Method for generating of seamless high gloss surfaces as well as objects with such a surface | [2014/45] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de surfaces hautement brillantes lisses et objets dotés d'une telle surface | [2014/45] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/18] | 07.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.04.2014 | AL | 28.02.2018 | CY | 28.02.2018 | CZ | 28.02.2018 | DK | 28.02.2018 | EE | 28.02.2018 | HR | 28.02.2018 | LT | 28.02.2018 | LV | 28.02.2018 | MC | 28.02.2018 | MK | 28.02.2018 | MT | 28.02.2018 | PT | 28.02.2018 | RS | 28.02.2018 | SI | 28.02.2018 | SK | 28.02.2018 | SM | 28.02.2018 | LU | 28.04.2018 | BE | 30.04.2018 | BG | 28.05.2018 | NO | 28.05.2018 | GR | 29.05.2018 | IS | 28.06.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 28.04.2014 | |
AL | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MK | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
PT | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
LU | 28.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 28.04.2014 | |
AL | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
PT | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
LU | 28.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
LU | 28.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
LU | 28.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
LU | 28.04.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0704285 (BIPAN SPA [IT]) [X] 1-12,14-16 * abstract * * column 6, lines 35-39 * * column 7, line 55 - column 8, line 28 * * column 12, lines 3-6 * * examples 1-3 * * claims 1,3 * [I] 13; | [X]WO2012084805 (KLEBCHEMIE M G BECKER GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-16 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE102009002048 |