EP2772267 - Immunogenic compositions and methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Longhorn Vaccines and Diagnostics, LLC 2 Bethesda Metro Center, Suite 910 Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | [2015/01] |
Former [2014/36] | For all designated states Longhorn Vaccines & Diagnostics, LLC 2 Bethesda Metro Center, Suite 910 Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Gerald W. 6417 Lybrook Drive Bethesda, MD 20817 / US | 02 /
Daum, Luke T. 318 Startwood Drive San Antonio, TX 78209 / US | [2014/36] | Representative(s) | Bond, Christopher William Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/36] | Bond, Christopher William Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14166377.3 | 27.08.2008 | [2014/36] | Priority number, date | US20070968145P | 27.08.2007 Original published format: US 968145 P | [2014/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2772267 | Date: | 03.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2772267 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2772267 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/09, A61K39/145, A61K39/085, A61K39/12, A61K39/102, C07K14/005 | [2015/42] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
A61K39/085 (EP,US);
A61K39/092 (EP,US);
A61K39/102 (EP,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61K39/145 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
C07K14/33 (US);
C07K14/35 (EP,US);
C07K7/06 (US);
C12N7/00 (EP,US);
A61K2039/525 (EP,US);
A61K2039/5252 (EP,US);
A61K2039/5254 (EP,US);
A61K2039/543 (EP,US);
A61K2039/545 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55566 (EP,US);
A61K2039/575 (US);
A61K2039/6037 (EP,US);
A61K2039/6043 (EP,US);
A61K2039/6068 (EP,US);
A61K2039/70 (EP,US);
C07K2319/40 (EP,US);
C07K2319/42 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/36] | A61K39/295, A61K39/145, A61K39/085, A61K39/116, A61K39/102, A61P31/16, A61P31/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/17] |
Former [2014/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Immunogene Zusammensetzungen und Verfahren | [2014/36] | English: | Immunogenic compositions and methods | [2014/36] | French: | Compositions immunogènes et procédés | [2014/36] | Examination procedure | 13.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/09] | 29.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08828704.0 / EP2185196 | Divisional application(s) | EP16158089.9 / EP3058954 | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.08.2008 | AT | 27.04.2016 | BG | 27.04.2016 | CY | 27.04.2016 | CZ | 27.04.2016 | DK | 27.04.2016 | EE | 27.04.2016 | ES | 27.04.2016 | FI | 27.04.2016 | HR | 27.04.2016 | IS | 27.04.2016 | IT | 27.04.2016 | LT | 27.04.2016 | LV | 27.04.2016 | MC | 27.04.2016 | NL | 27.04.2016 | PL | 27.04.2016 | RO | 27.04.2016 | SI | 27.04.2016 | SK | 27.04.2016 | TR | 27.04.2016 | NO | 27.07.2016 | GR | 28.07.2016 | LU | 27.08.2016 | PT | 29.08.2016 | MT | 31.08.2016 | [2018/45] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 27.08.2008 | |
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
LU | 27.08.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/33] | HU | 27.08.2008 | |
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
LU | 27.08.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 27.08.2008 | |
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
LU | 27.08.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
LU | 27.08.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 27.04.2016 | |
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 27.04.2016 | |
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/44] | NL | 27.04.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2007051036 (PROTELIX INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * p. 7-26; examples; p. 24, l. 5-12; p. 26, l. 13-19; p. 30, l. 13-14; claims *; | [A]WO2007056266 (SIDNEY KIMMEL CANCER CT [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * 0020-0025; 0035; 0041-0045; 0058-0066; 0071-0072; 0079; 0084; 0086-0091; 0097-0133; 0160; 0205-0250; claims *; | [AD] - DANILA VALMORI ET AL, "Use of human universally antigenic tetanus toxin T cell epitopes as carriers for human vaccination", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF IMMUNOLOGISTS, US, (19920715), vol. 149, no. 2, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 717 - 721, XP002173089 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.149.2.717 | by applicant | US4196265 | US4356170 | US4372945 | US4474757 | US4554101 | US4596792 | US4599231 | US4599230 | US4601903 | US4608251 | US4634664 | US4634666 | US4668476 | US4746490 | US4816513 | US5145684 | US5182109 | US5186898 | US5399363 | WO9508348 | US5482856 | US5503841 | US5543158 | US5552157 | US5565213 | US5567434 | US5641515 | US5656016 | US5679356 | US5697899 | US5738868 | US5741516 | US5770219 | US5779708 | US5783208 | US5785975 | US5795582 | US5795587 | US5797898 | US5800810 | US6033673 | US6060068 | US6306404 | US6440423 | US6451325 | US6500432 | US6534065 | US6572866 | WO03053462 | US6603998 | US6713068 | WO2004043407 | US6759241 | US6780421 | US6793928 | US2004223976 | US2005169941 | US7090853 | US7223409 | US2008032921 | US2008069821 | US2008075708 | US7357936 | US2008107687 | US2008107665 | US2008118531 | US2008145373 | US2008181914 | US2008181905 | - ARTHUR OSOL AND JOHN E. HOOVER, Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences 15th Edition, MACK PUBLISHING CO.,, pages 1032-35 - 1570-80 | - Antibodies: A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR PRESS | - STITES ET AL., Basic and Clinical Immunology(4th ed.), MEDICAL PUBLICATIONS | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - CONLEY ET AL., VACCINE, (1994), vol. 12, pages 445 - 451 | - FENG; DOOLITTLE, J. MOL. EVOL., (1987), vol. 35, pages 351 - 360 | - HENIKOFF; HENIKOFF, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 89, page 10915 | - HIGGINS; SHARP, COMPUT. APPL. BIOSCI., (1989), vol. 5, pages 151 - 153 | - KARLIN; ALTSCHUL, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 5873 - 5787 | - KOHLER; MILSTEIN, NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, pages 495 - 497 | - LOU, M., NATURE, (200609), vol. 443, pages 37 - 38 | - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, page 443 | - PEARSON; LIPMAN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, page 2444 | - SMITH; WATERMAN, ADV. APPL. MATH., (1981), vol. 2, page 482 | - TOLMAN ET AL., INT. J. PEP. PROTO RES., (1993), vol. 41, pages 455 - 466 |