EP2840586 - Self-retention compression spring with housing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.10.2020 [2020/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2015/09] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rojko, Jan 1207 Dover Place SE Conyers, GA 30013 / US | [2015/09] | Application number, filing date | 14166595.0 | 30.04.2014 | [2015/09] | Priority number, date | US201361868106P | 21.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361868106 P | [2015/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2840586 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01H71/02, // F16F1/12 | [2015/09] | CPC: |
H01H71/0228 (EP,US);
F16F1/06 (US);
F16F1/125 (EP,US);
F16F1/3665 (US);
H01H3/3052 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/40] |
Former [2015/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Selbsthemmende Druckfeder mit Gehäuse | [2015/09] | English: | Self-retention compression spring with housing | [2015/09] | French: | Ressort de compression à rétention automatique avec logement | [2015/09] | Examination procedure | 12.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/40] | 16.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/44] | 24.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]FR2410183 (NORMANDIE ATEL METALLURG MECA [FR]) [I] 1 * page 2, line 21 - page 3, line 9; figures 1-2 * [Y] 2,3; | [X]GB2026246 (DELTA MATERIALS RESEARCH LTD) [X] 1,5,6 * page 1, line 95 - page 2, line 27; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP0437220 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 2,3 * column 4, line 50 - column 5, line 16 *; | [I]DE19937488 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [I] 1,2 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 2; figures 4-7 *; | [IY]DE19943629 (STIHL MASCHF ANDREAS [DE]) [I] 1 * column 7, lines 12-35; figures 16-18 * [Y] 4; | [Y]EP2355121 (LS IND SYSTEMS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 4* paragraphs [0019] - [0078]; figures 3 - 12 * |