EP2804143 - System and method for forwarding a graphics command stream [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.10.2016 [2016/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 2236008 Ontario Inc. 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2014/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dodge, Danny Thomas 1001 Farrar Road, Ext. 24202 Kanata, Ontario K2K 0B3 / CA | 02 /
Belanger, Etienne 1001 Farrar Road Ext. 24368 Kanata, Ontario K2K 0B3 / CA | [2014/47] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/47] | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14167647.8 | 09.05.2014 | [2014/47] | Priority number, date | US201361822730P | 13.05.2013 Original published format: US 201361822730 P | [2014/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2804143 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06T1/20 | [2014/47] | CPC: |
G06T1/20 (EP,US);
G06T9/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/26] |
Former [2014/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Weiterleitung eines Grafikbefehlstroms | [2014/47] | English: | System and method for forwarding a graphics command stream | [2014/47] | French: | Système et procédé permettant de transférer un flux de commande graphique | [2014/47] | Examination procedure | 14.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/26] | 03.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/43] | 21.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2011078532 (VONOG STANISLAV [US], et al) [X] 1,14 * abstract * * figures 1,4-7 * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0095] * [A] 10,11; | [XI]US2011157196 (NAVE ITAY [IL], et al) [X] 1-9,12-14 * abstract * * figures 1,2,13,17 * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0260] - paragraph [0263] * * paragraphs [0047] , [0155] , [0168] , [0186] , [0191] , [0243] * [I] 10,11; | [X] - A. JURGELIONIS ET AL, "Platform for Distributed 3D Gaming", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF COMPUTER GAMES TECHNOLOGY, (20090101), vol. 2009, doi:10.1109/TCSVT.2003.815173, ISSN 1687-7047, pages 1 - 15, XP055100897 [X] 1,14 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * section 4.1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/2009/231863 |