EP2806372 - System for providing a continuous communication link with a symbol reading device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hand Held Products, Inc. 9680 Old Bailes Road Fort Mill, SC 29707 / US | [2014/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smith, Taylor HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P. O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | 02 /
Schmidt, Mark HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P. O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | [2014/48] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/26] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | ||
Former [2014/48] | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14167806.0 | 09.05.2014 | [2014/48] | Priority number, date | US201313902242 | 24.05.2013 Original published format: US201313902242 | [2014/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2806372 | Date: | 26.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2806372 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | [2014/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2806372 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/10, G06F13/38, G06K17/00 | [2014/51] | CPC: |
G06K7/10881 (EP,US);
H04L67/01 (US);
G06K17/0022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/48] | Title | German: | System zur Bereitstellung einer kontinuierlichen Kommunikationsverbindung mit einer Symbollesevorrichtung | [2014/48] | English: | System for providing a continuous communication link with a symbol reading device | [2014/48] | French: | Système pour fournir une liaison de communication continue avec un dispositif de lecture de symboles | [2014/48] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/48] | 02.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 13.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP21180704.5 / EP3916617 | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.05.2014 | AL | 30.06.2021 | AT | 30.06.2021 | CY | 30.06.2021 | CZ | 30.06.2021 | DK | 30.06.2021 | EE | 30.06.2021 | ES | 30.06.2021 | FI | 30.06.2021 | HR | 30.06.2021 | LT | 30.06.2021 | LV | 30.06.2021 | MC | 30.06.2021 | MK | 30.06.2021 | MT | 30.06.2021 | PL | 30.06.2021 | RO | 30.06.2021 | RS | 30.06.2021 | SE | 30.06.2021 | SI | 30.06.2021 | SK | 30.06.2021 | SM | 30.06.2021 | TR | 30.06.2021 | BG | 30.09.2021 | NO | 30.09.2021 | GR | 01.10.2021 | IS | 30.10.2021 | PT | 02.11.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 09.05.2014 | |
AL | 30.06.2021 | ||
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CY | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
MK | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
TR | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 09.05.2014 | |
AL | 30.06.2021 | ||
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CY | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
MK | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 09.05.2014 | |
AL | 30.06.2021 | ||
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CY | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 09.05.2014 | |
AL | 30.06.2021 | ||
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/19] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LT | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
MC | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SI | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 30.06.2021 | |
AT | 30.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
DK | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
EE | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
PL | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
IS | 30.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
RO | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SK | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
PT | 02.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
CZ | 30.06.2021 | ||
ES | 30.06.2021 | ||
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 30.06.2021 | |
FI | 30.06.2021 | ||
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
SM | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 30.06.2021 | |
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
RS | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 30.06.2021 | |
HR | 30.06.2021 | ||
LV | 30.06.2021 | ||
SE | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
NO | 30.09.2021 | ||
GR | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 30.06.2021 | |
BG | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 30.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003209605 (WALCZYK JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0024]; figures 1a,1b,2a *; | [X]US2005044172 (PHILYAW JEFFRY JOVAN [US]) [X] 1-10* paragraphs [0060] , [0096]; figure 16 *; | [X]US2006006231 (ANSON GARY S [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0030] , [0036] , [0042]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2008035734 (CHALLA NAGESH [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0050]; figure 3 *; | [X]US2008093456 (PASIK GREGORY [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0035] , [0036]; figures 2,3 *; | [X]US2012223141 (GOOD TIMOTHY [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0087]; figures 3b,7 * | by applicant | US6832725 | US7159783 | US7413127 | US2009134221 | US2010177749 | US2010177080 | US2010177707 | US2010177076 | US2010225757 | US2012111946 | US2012168511 | US2012168512 | US2012193423 | US2012193407 | US2012203647 | US2012223141 | US2012228382 | US2012248188 | US8294969 | US8317105 | US8322622 | US2012318869 | US8366005 | US8371507 | US8376233 | US2013043312 | US8381979 | US8390909 | US2013056285 | US2013068840 | US2013070322 | US2013075168 | US2013075464 | US8408469 | US8408468 | US8408464 | US2013082104 | US8424768 | US8448863 | US8457013 |