EP2804286 - Apparatus and method with active balancing circuit and active balancing algorithm for charging and discharging secondary batteries connected in series [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG CNS Co., Ltd. 24 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-881 / KR | For all designated states HBL Corporation 32-48, Yuseong-daero 1596 beon-gil Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-811 / KR | [2014/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Jeong Moog c/o 24, Yeoui-daero, Yeongdeungpo-gu 150-881 Seoul / KR | 02 /
Lee, Hwan Hee c/o 24, Yeoui-daero, Yeongdeungpo-gu 150-881 Seoul / KR | 03 /
Ryu, Tae Hyoung c/o 24, Yeoui-daero, Yeongdeungpo-gu 150-881 Seoul / KR | 04 /
Shin, Dong Hoon c/o 24, Yeoui-daero, Yeongdeungpo-gu 150-881 Seoul / KR | 05 /
Han, Cheol Kyu c/o 24, Yeoui-daero, Yeongdeungpo-gu 150-881 Seoul / KR | [2014/47] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2014/47] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 14168108.0 | 13.05.2014 | [2014/47] | Priority number, date | KR20130054978 | 15.05.2013 Original published format: KR 20130054978 | [2014/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2804286 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2804286 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00 | [2014/47] | CPC: |
H02J7/0016 (EP,US);
H02J7/00 (KR);
H02J7/0014 (US);
H02J7/04 (KR);
H02J7/00047 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/47] |
Former [2014/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren mit aktiver Ausgleichsschaltung und aktivem Ausgleichsalgorithmus zum Laden und Entladen von in Reihe geschalteten Sekundärbatterien | [2014/47] | English: | Apparatus and method with active balancing circuit and active balancing algorithm for charging and discharging secondary batteries connected in series | [2014/47] | French: | Appareil et procédé à circuit d'équilibrage actif et algorithme d'équilibrage actif de chargement et de déchargement de batteries secondaires connectées en série | [2014/47] | Examination procedure | 13.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/47] | 03.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/19] | 03.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/19] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 09.10.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 09.10.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.11.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6121751 (MERRITT LAUREN V [US]) [I] 1-13 * abstract * * column 1, line 42 - column 2, line 38 * * column 3, line 1 - column 5, line 26; figure 1 *; | [A]US2002047685 (PERELLE MICHEL [FR]) [A] 1-13 * page 3, paragraph 31 - page 4, paragraph 54; figure yes *; | [I]US6388424 (HIDAKA TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [I] 1-13 * column 3, line 38 - column 6, line 43; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2010001737 (KUBO KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 7, paragraph 69 - page 8, paragraph 83; figures 1,2 * * page 14, paragraph 132 - paragraph 134; figure 10 *; | [A]WO2011053951 (IFTRON TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 3 - page 5, paragraph 21 * * page 12, paragraph 63 - page 13, paragraph 65; figure 6 ** page 16, paragraph 81 - page 17, paragraph 83; figure 9 *; | [I]WO2013007881 (EUROP BATTERIES OY [FI], et al) [I] 1-13 * page 6, line 21 - page 9, line 36; figures 3,4A,4C *; | [E]EP2784902 (LG CNS CO LTD [KR], et al) [E] 1,3,4,6,10,13 * column 3, paragraph 16; claim 1 * * column 6, paragraph 35 - column 11, paragraph 76; figures 2-4 * | by applicant | KR20100122911 | KR20110008337 |