EP2944199 - Food casing with fungicidal characteristics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2017 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ViskoTeepak Belgium NV Maatheide 81 3920 Lommel / BE | [2015/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wielockx, Pierre Driekooien 80 3920 Lommel / BE | 02 /
Quinten, Johan Heide 175 3920 Lommel / BE | [2015/47] | Representative(s) | Papula Oy P.O. Box 981 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2015/47] | Application number, filing date | 14168138.7 | 13.05.2014 | [2015/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2944199 | Date: | 18.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2944199 | Date: | 31.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A22C13/00, C08K5/053 | [2015/47] | CPC: |
A22C13/0013 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/09] |
Former [2015/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Lebensmittelhülle mit fungizider Ausstattung | [2016/16] | English: | Food casing with fungicidal characteristics | [2015/47] | French: | Emballage alimentaire doté d'un fongicide | [2016/16] |
Former [2015/47] | Lebensmittelhülle mit fungizider Ausstattung | ||
Former [2015/47] | Emballage alimentaire doté d'un fongicide | Examination procedure | 22.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/09] | 21.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.05.2014 | AL | 31.08.2016 | AT | 31.08.2016 | BE | 31.08.2016 | CY | 31.08.2016 | CZ | 31.08.2016 | DK | 31.08.2016 | EE | 31.08.2016 | ES | 31.08.2016 | FI | 31.08.2016 | HR | 31.08.2016 | IT | 31.08.2016 | LT | 31.08.2016 | LV | 31.08.2016 | MC | 31.08.2016 | MK | 31.08.2016 | NL | 31.08.2016 | PL | 31.08.2016 | RO | 31.08.2016 | RS | 31.08.2016 | SE | 31.08.2016 | SI | 31.08.2016 | SK | 31.08.2016 | SM | 31.08.2016 | TR | 31.08.2016 | BG | 30.11.2016 | NO | 30.11.2016 | GR | 01.12.2016 | IS | 31.12.2016 | PT | 02.01.2017 | IE | 13.05.2017 | LU | 13.05.2017 | MT | 13.05.2017 | CH | 31.05.2017 | FR | 31.05.2017 | LI | 31.05.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 13.05.2014 | |
AL | 31.08.2016 | ||
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
MK | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
TR | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
IE | 13.05.2017 | ||
LU | 13.05.2017 | ||
MT | 13.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 13.05.2014 | |
AL | 31.08.2016 | ||
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
MK | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
IE | 13.05.2017 | ||
LU | 13.05.2017 | ||
MT | 13.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HU | 13.05.2014 | |
AL | 31.08.2016 | ||
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
IE | 13.05.2017 | ||
LU | 13.05.2017 | ||
MT | 13.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 13.05.2014 | |
AL | 31.08.2016 | ||
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
IE | 13.05.2017 | ||
LU | 13.05.2017 | ||
MT | 13.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 31.08.2016 | |
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
IE | 13.05.2017 | ||
LU | 13.05.2017 | ||
MT | 13.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
IE | 13.05.2017 | ||
LU | 13.05.2017 | ||
MT | 13.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
IE | 13.05.2017 | ||
LU | 13.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
IE | 13.05.2017 | ||
LU | 13.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
LU | 13.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 31.08.2016 | |
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 31.08.2016 | |
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 31.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4867204 (ELLIS DAVID E [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 6, line 13 - line 20 *; | [A]US5262211 (HAMMER KLAUS-DIETER [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 2, line 11 - line 46 *; | [A] - Arch Chemicals, "Zinc Pyrithione - Product Stewardship summary", (20080831), URL: http://www.archchemicals.com/Fed/Corporate/Docs/ACC/ARCH_CHEMICALS-ZINC_PYRITHIONE.pdf, (20140527), XP055120311 [A] 1-15 * page 2, paragraph 1 * | [A] - JERUSIK ET AL, "Fungi and paper manufacture", FUNGAL BIOLOGY REVIEWS, ELSEVIER LTD, GB, vol. 24, no. 1-2, ISSN 1749-4613, (20100201), pages 68 - 72, (20100702), XP027416445 [A] 1-15 * abstract * | by applicant | US4818436 | US4161526 | US5883154 |