EP2767933 - Method and system for edge detection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.02.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2016 [2016/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Verint Systems Ltd. 33 Maskit 46733 Herzilya Pituach / IL | [2014/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Golan, Oren 5 Dekel St Apt 17 Or-Yehuda 6040705 / IL | 02 /
Kiro, Shmuel 5 Rimon Str 76342 Rehovot / IL | 03 /
Horovitz, Itshak Heil Hayam 5 Rishon lezion / IL | [2014/43] |
Former [2014/34] | 01 /
Golan, Oren 8 Ze'alon St 60407 Or-Yehuda / IL | ||
02 /
Kiro, Shmuel 5 Rimon Str 76342 Rehovot / IL | |||
03 /
Horovitz, Itshak Heil Hayam 5 Rishon lezion / IL | Representative(s) | Bibby, William Mark, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thames Middlesex, TW18 4PR / GB | [2014/34] | Application number, filing date | 14168487.8 | 21.05.2008 | [2014/34] | Priority number, date | US20080038962P | 24.03.2008 Original published format: US 38962 P | US20080107976 | 23.04.2008 Original published format: US 107976 | [2014/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2767933 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2767933 | Date: | 01.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/46, G06K9/52, G06K9/00 | [2015/14] | CPC: |
G06V10/443 (EP,US);
G06T5/00 (US);
G06T7/13 (EP,US);
G06V10/431 (EP,US);
G06V40/10 (US);
G06V40/171 (US)
|
Former IPC [2014/34] | G06K9/46, G06K9/52 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2014/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Kantenerkennung | [2014/34] | English: | Method and system for edge detection | [2014/34] | French: | Procédé et système de détection du bord | [2014/34] | Examination procedure | 15.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/34] | 02.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/13] | 09.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/13] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08251770.7 / EP2105866 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   25.09.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2007122025 (CHRISTIAN ALLEN T [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0037] * * figures 2,3,5 *; | [A] - KOVESI P, "Image features from phase congruency", VIDERE: JOURNAL OF COMPUTER VISION RESEARCH, MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, US, (19990621), vol. 1, no. 3, ISSN 1089-2788, pages 2 - 26, XP008060234 [A] 1-15 * the whole document, in particular Section 7. "Extensions to two-dimensions" and Section 9.1. "Parameters" * | [A] - PELLEGRINO F A ET AL, "Edge Detection Revisited", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SYSTEMS, MAN AND CYBERNETICS. PART B:CYBERNETICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20040601), vol. 34, no. 3, ISSN 1083-4419, pages 1500 - 1518, XP011113042 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TSMCB.2004.824147 |