EP2946860 - Suction device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.10.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstrasse 100 9494 Schaan / LI | [2015/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Appel, Hans Buschrosenweg 1 81377 München / DE | [2015/48] | Representative(s) | Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [2015/48] | Application number, filing date | 14168923.2 | 20.05.2014 | [2015/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2946860 | Date: | 25.11.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B23B47/34, B23B51/06, B25D17/02, B23Q11/00, B23Q17/00 | [2015/48] | CPC: |
B23B47/34 (EP,CN,US);
B25D17/20 (US);
B23B51/06 (EP,CN,US);
B23Q11/0046 (EP,CN,US);
B23Q17/00 (EP,CN,US);
B25D16/00 (US);
B25D17/02 (EP,CN,US);
B23B2270/62 (EP,CN,US);
B25D2211/068 (EP,US);
B25D2217/0057 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Absaugvorrichtung | [2015/48] | English: | Suction device | [2015/48] | French: | Dispositif d'aspiration | [2015/48] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/46] | 01.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4711609 (SEEFLUTH U CHRISTIAN [DE]) [A] 1-7* figures 6,7,9,10 *; | [A]US2005034715 (TERPSTRA STEVEN [AU]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0090]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE102006031507 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0025] , [0026]; figure 3 *; | [AD]US2013136549 (APPEL HANS [DE], et al) [AD] 1-7 * paragraphs [0041] - [0044]; figures 1,4 * | by applicant | US2013136549 |