EP2806096 - Method for implementing a closure or sun-protection facility, and corresponding facility [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Somfy SAS 50, Avenue du Nouveau Monde 74300 Cluses / FR | [2014/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Noël, Franck 1386 Route d'Alloup 74130 Mont Saxonnex / FR | 02 /
Tranchand, Alain 146 Route d'Avully 74330 La Balme de Sillingy / FR | 03 /
Roussel, Jean-Paul Lieu dit La Vulpiere 2111 route de Montferrond 74300 Magland / FR | 04 /
Lozano, Philippe Rue de Marcelly 74440 Taninges / FR | 05 /
Meny, Frédéric 4 rue du Lomont 25150 Autechaux-Roide / FR | 06 /
Cachalou, Laurent 1 Bis Rue François Géant 90000 Belfort / FR | [2014/48] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | [2016/41] |
Former [2014/48] | Myon, Gérard Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 69003 Lyon / FR | Application number, filing date | 14169476.0 | 22.05.2014 | [2014/48] | Priority number, date | FR20130054664 | 23.05.2013 Original published format: FR 1354664 | [2014/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2806096 | Date: | 26.11.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2806096 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/11, E06B9/58, E06B9/92, E06B9/17 | [2014/48] | CPC: |
E06B9/11 (EP);
E06B9/17061 (EP);
E06B9/58 (EP);
E06B9/92 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/41] |
Former [2014/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Implementierung einer Verschluss- oder Sonnenschutzanlage, und entsprechende Anlage | [2014/48] | English: | Method for implementing a closure or sun-protection facility, and corresponding facility | [2014/48] | French: | Procédé de mise en oeuvre d'une installation de fermeture ou de protection solaire, et installation correspondante | [2014/48] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/05] | 26.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.05.2014 | AL | 12.10.2016 | AT | 12.10.2016 | CY | 12.10.2016 | CZ | 12.10.2016 | DK | 12.10.2016 | EE | 12.10.2016 | ES | 12.10.2016 | FI | 12.10.2016 | HR | 12.10.2016 | IT | 12.10.2016 | LT | 12.10.2016 | LV | 12.10.2016 | MC | 12.10.2016 | MK | 12.10.2016 | MT | 12.10.2016 | NL | 12.10.2016 | PL | 12.10.2016 | RO | 12.10.2016 | RS | 12.10.2016 | SE | 12.10.2016 | SI | 12.10.2016 | SK | 12.10.2016 | SM | 12.10.2016 | TR | 12.10.2016 | BG | 12.01.2017 | NO | 12.01.2017 | GR | 13.01.2017 | IS | 12.02.2017 | PT | 13.02.2017 | IE | 22.05.2017 | LU | 22.05.2017 | BE | 31.05.2017 | CH | 31.05.2017 | LI | 31.05.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 22.05.2014 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
MK | 12.10.2016 | ||
MT | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
TR | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
IE | 22.05.2017 | ||
LU | 22.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 22.05.2014 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
MK | 12.10.2016 | ||
MT | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
IE | 22.05.2017 | ||
LU | 22.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 22.05.2014 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
MT | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
IE | 22.05.2017 | ||
LU | 22.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 22.05.2014 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
MT | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
IE | 22.05.2017 | ||
LU | 22.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
MT | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
IE | 22.05.2017 | ||
LU | 22.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
IE | 22.05.2017 | ||
LU | 22.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
IE | 22.05.2017 | ||
LU | 22.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
LU | 22.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 12.10.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]FR2941996 (SOPROFEN [FR]) [I] 1-3,5-11,14 * page 7, lines 8-27; figures 1-5 * * page 8, line 20 - page 11, line 19 * [A] 4,12,13; | [IA]FR2962759 (FRANCIAFLEX [FR]) [I] 1-3,5-11,14 * page 9, line 19 - page 7, line 9; figures 1-5B * * page 8, line 15 - page 9, line 5 * * page 9, line 31 - page 14, line 18 * [A] 4,12,13; | [I]DE202011102653U (REINER DETENHOFF GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [I] 1-3,5-11,14 * paragraphs [0054] , [0055] , [0060] , [0063] , [0069] , [0078] - [0081]; figures 1-3, 9, 12, 16, 17 *; | [I]EP2216494 (ROMA ROLLADENSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [I] 1,14 * paragraphs [0068] , [0071] , [0072] , [0077] , [0079] , [0080] , [0084]; figures 1, 5, 6, 16-20; claim 1 * | by applicant | EP2216494 | WO2011007335 | FR2941996 |