EP2918271 - Aromatic alkenoic acid derivatives as aroma compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.10.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Symrise AG Patentabteilung Gebäude D 211 Mühlenfeldstrasse 1 37603 Holzminden / DE | [2015/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ley, Jakob Schubertstrasse 5a 37603 Holzminden / DE | 02 /
Reichert, Katharina Haydnweg 5 37603 Holzminden / DE | 03 /
Obst, Katja Mittlere Strasse 11 37603 Holzminden / DE | [2015/38] | Representative(s) | Fabry, Bernd IP2 Patentanwalts GmbH Schlossstrasse 523 41238 Mönchengladbach / DE | [2015/38] | Application number, filing date | 14170001.3 | 27.05.2014 | [2015/38] | Priority number, date | EP20140159306 | 12.03.2014 Original published format: EP 14159306 | [2015/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2918271 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/36, C07C57/44, C07D317/64 | [2015/38] | CPC: |
C07D317/60 (EP,US);
A23G1/32 (EP,US);
A23G1/42 (EP,US);
A23G3/36 (EP,US);
A23G3/364 (EP,US);
A23L33/10 (EP,US);
A23L33/30 (EP,US);
A61K31/36 (EP,US);
A61K31/4525 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Aromatische Alkensäurederivate als Würzstoffe | [2015/38] | English: | Aromatic alkenoic acid derivatives as aroma compounds | [2015/38] | French: | Derivées d'acides alkenoiques aromatiques comme matières d'arome | [2015/38] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/45] | 25.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP2725018 (TASLY PHARMACEUTICAL GROUP CO [CN]) [XP] 1-14 * the whole document *; | WO2013000399 [ ] (TASLY PHARMACEUTICAL GROUP CO [CN], et al) [ ] * the whole document *; | [XP]EP2716303 (TAKASAGO PERFUMERY CO LTD [JP]) [XP] 1-14 * paragraphs [0026] , [0028]; claim 3 *; | WO2012165406 [ ] (TAKASAGO PERFUMERY CO LTD [JP], et al) [ ] * paragraphs [0050] , [0052]; claim 3 *; | [XD]EP2529632 (SYMRISE AG [DE]) [XD] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [XD]US2004202760 (DEWIS MARK L [US], et al) [XD] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X] - LINDH J ET AL, "Efficient palladium(II) catalysis under air. Base-free oxidative heck reactions at room temperature or with microwave heating", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (20071012), vol. 72, no. 21, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 7957 - 7962, XP002727912 [X] 1-4 * table 1; compounds 3e, 3f * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo701434s | [X] - PREVOST M S ET AL, "Identification of cinnamic acid derivatives as novel antagonists of the prokaryotic proton-gated ion channel GLIC", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY USA, (20130613), vol. 56, no. 11, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 4619 - 4630, XP002727913 [X] 1-4 * figure 2; compounds 1,12 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm400374q | [X] - NAVICKIENE HOSANA MARIA D ET AL, "Antifungal amides from Piper hispidum and Piper tuberculatum", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (OXFORD), (200011), vol. 55, no. 6, ISSN 0031-9422, pages 621 - 626, XP027253845 [X] 1-4 * page 622; compounds 1, 4, 7, 8, 9 * | [X] - DE ARAUJO-JUNIOR J X ET AL, "Synthesis of natural amide alkaloid piperdardine and a new bioactive analogue", SYNTHETIC COMMUNICATIONS, US, (2001), vol. 31, no. 1, ISSN 0039-7911, pages 117 - 123, XP002727914 [X] 1-4 * page 118; figure 1; compound 2a * * page 119; compounds 4,5,7,8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1081/SCC-100000187 | [X] - DE ARAUJO JR J X ET AL, "Synthesis of piperamides and new analogues from natural safrole", SYNTHETIC COMMUNICATIONS, US, (1999), vol. 29, no. 2, ISSN 0039-7911, pages 263 - 273, XP002727915 [X] 1-4 * page 265; compounds 4,5,6a * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/00397919908085766 | [X] - CHEN J J ET AL, "Cytotoxic constituents of Piper sintenense", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, (2003), vol. 86, ISSN 2058-2064, XP002728154 [X] 1-4 * page 2060; compounds 7,10 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hlca.200390161 | [X] - DING Z ET AL, "AMIDES FROM ASARUM-CHINGCHENGENSE", PHYTOCHEMISTRY (OXFORD), (1991), vol. 30, no. 11, ISSN 0031-9422, pages 3797 - 3798, XP002727916 [X] 1-4 * page 3797, column r; compound 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0031-9422(91)80113-F | [X] - BEATRIZ LANTAÑO ET AL, "Scope of the formal [3+2] cycloaddition for the synthesis of five-membered ring of functionalized indanes", TETRAHEDRON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 68, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.TET.2011.10.089, ISSN 0040-4020, (20111025), pages 913 - 921, (20111122), XP028339479 [X] 1-4 * table 1; compound 14 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tet.2011.10.089 | [X] - ADHIKARI S ET AL, "Stereoselective radical annulation route to the synthesis of (+/-)-paulownin and (+/-)-isogmelinol", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, PERGAMON, GB, vol. 33, no. 40, doi:10.1016/S0040-4039(00)61118-8, ISSN 0040-4039, (19920929), pages 6025 - 6026, (19920929), XP028085797 [X] 1-4 * page 6025; compound 2a * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)61118-8 | [X] - EE GWENDOLINE CHENG LIAN ET AL, "Pellitorine, a potential anti-cancer lead compound against HL6 and MCT-7 cell lines and microbial transformation of piperine from Piper Nigrum.", MOLECULES, (BASEL, SWITZERLAND), (201004), vol. 15, no. 4, ISSN 1420-3049, pages 2398 - 2404, XP002727917 [X] 1-4 * page 2399; figure 1; compound 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/molecules15042398 | [X] - Peng Wang, Jin Cai, Jiabin Yang, Chunlong Sun, Lushen Lia, Min Ji, "Solvent-Dependent Regioselective Oxidation of trans-Chalcones using Aqueous Hydrogen Peroxide", Journal of the Brazilian Chemical Society, Brazil, vol. 24, no. 3, doi:10.5935/0103-5053.20130063, (2013), pages 518 - 522, Sociedade Brasileira de Química, URL: http://www.scielo.br/pdf/jbchs/v24n3/20.pdf, (20140729), XP002727918 [X] 1-4 * table 2; compounds 2a, 2l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5935/0103-5053.20130063 | [X] - CHRISTOPHER J. O'BRIEN ET AL, "Part I: The Development of the Catalytic Wittig Reaction", CHEMISTRY - A EUROPEAN JOURNAL, (20131104), vol. 19, no. 45, doi:10.1002/chem.201301444, ISSN 0947-6539, pages 15281 - 15289, XP055113637 [X] 1-4 * page 15285; table 6; compounds 4,24 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/chem.201301444 | [X] - SHARMA U K ET AL, "Synthesis and SAR investigation of natural phenylpropene-derived methoxylated cinnamaldehydes and their novel Schiff bases as potent antimicrobial and antioxidant agents", MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY RESEARCH, BIRKHAUSER BOSTON USA, (201311), vol. 22, no. 11, ISSN 1054-2523, pages 5129 - 5140, XP002727919 [X] 1-4 * page 5136; figure 1; compounds 17,19,21 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00044-013-0484-9 | [X] - MIHOKO UCHIDA ET AL, "Antioxidative Effect of Sesamol and Related Compounds on Lipid Peroxidation", BIOLOGICAL & PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN (OF JAPAN), PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, TOKYO, JP, (19960101), vol. 19, no. 4, ISSN 0918-6158, pages 623 - 626, XP008115197 [X] 1-4 * page 624; table 1; compound 9 * | [X] - DAVIES S G ET AL, "Homochiral lithium amides for the asymmetric synthesis of beta-amino acids", TETRAHEDRON ASYMMETRY, PERGAMON PRESS LTD, OXFORD, GB, vol. 17, no. 12, doi:10.1016/J.TETASY.2006.05.008, ISSN 0957-4166, (20060731), pages 1793 - 1811, (20060731), XP024961988 [X] 1-4 * page 1805, column l, lines 3-4, paragraph 3.34 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tetasy.2006.05.008 | [X] - TRAXLER J T, "PIPERANINE A PUNGENT COMPONENT OF BLACK PEPPER-D", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, (1971), vol. 19, no. 6, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 1135 - 1138, XP002727920 [X] 1-4 * page 1137, column l; figure 1; compounds 4,5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf60178a026 | [X] - PEDERSEN MIKAEL E ET AL, "Amides from Piper capense with CNS activity - a preliminary SAR analysis", MOLECULES, MOLECULAR DIVERSITY PRESERVATION INTERNATIONAL, BASEL, CH, vol. 14, no. 9, doi:10.3390/MOLECULES14093833, ISSN 1420-3049, (20090101), pages 3833 - 3843, (20090925), XP002591353 [X] 1-4 * page 3834; figure 1; compounds 2,5,7-9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/MOLECULES14093833 | by applicant | EP1989944 | WO2008046895 | EP2168442 | US2004202760 | US2006057268 | US2007134389 | WO03004992 | WO03001876 | US2005084506 | EP2529632 | US3159585 | US3971852 | US4532145 | US5124162 |