EP2950171 - Method and industrial controller for determining the energy requirement of automation components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2015/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mantel, Martin Alleestraße 43a 91452 Wilhermsdorf / DE | [2015/49] | Application number, filing date | 14170102.9 | 27.05.2014 | [2015/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2950171 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/05, G05B19/042 | [2015/49] | CPC: |
G05B19/058 (EP);
G05B19/0428 (EP);
G05B2219/15097 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und industrielle Steuerung zur Ermittlung der Energieaufnahme von Automatisierungskomponenten | [2015/49] | English: | Method and industrial controller for determining the energy requirement of automation components | [2015/49] | French: | Procédé et commande industrielle de détermination de la réception d'énergie de composants d'automatisation | [2015/49] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/49] | 12.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2400360 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,6 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0031] * [I] 2-5; | [XI]EP1936454 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,6 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0037] * [I] 2-5; | [A]DE10104892 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,6 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0012] *; | [A]DE10231797 (INST MASCHINEN ANTRIEBE UND EL [DE]) [A] 1,6 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0015] * |