EP2811406 - Dependent applications monitoring [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.2020 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.04.2020 [2020/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2014/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHHASHI, Hideki c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 02 /
HIRAI, Kohichi c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2014/50] | Representative(s) | White, Duncan Rohan, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/50] | Maury, Richard Philip Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 14170587.1 | 30.05.2014 | [2014/50] | Priority number, date | JP20130116700 | 03.06.2013 Original published format: JP 2013116700 | [2014/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2811406 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/30, G06F11/07 | [2014/50] | CPC: |
G06F11/0769 (EP,US);
G06F9/485 (US);
G06F11/0709 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Überwachung abhängiger Anwendungen | [2014/50] | English: | Dependent applications monitoring | [2014/50] | French: | Surveillance d'applications dépendantes | [2014/50] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/50] | 10.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/18] | 19.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - "Virtualizing Business-Critical Applications with Confidence Virtualizing Business-Critical Applications with Confidence Challenges Using Traditional High-Availability Solutions High Availability in VMware Environments", (20110428), pages 1 - 9, URL: http://www.vmware.com/files/pdf/techpaper/vsp4-virtualize-biz-critical-apps.pdf, (20140828), XP055137131 [X] 1,4,7 * first, second, third and last paragraphs; page 5 * * page 8, figure 6 * * page 5, figure 3 * [I] 2,3,5,6,8,9 |