EP2840487 - Systems, methods, and software to present human machine interfaces on a mobile device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.01.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwell Automation Technologies, Inc. 1 Allen-Bradley Drive Mayfield Heights, OH 44124 / US | [2015/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Billi, Sharon M. 25801 Lakeshore Blvd 15 Euclid Ohio 44132 / US | 02 /
Carrara, Anthony 17168 Penny Pinces Circle Strongsville Ohio 44136 / US | 03 /
Pantaleano, Michael 4273 River Street Willoughby Ohio 44094 / US | 04 /
Miller, Scott A. 104 Stonebridge Drive Oakdale Pennsylvania 15071 / US | [2015/09] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/09] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14170597.0 | 30.05.2014 | [2015/09] | Priority number, date | US201361829594P | 31.05.2013 Original published format: US 201361829594 P | [2015/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2840487 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44 | [2015/09] | CPC: |
G06F8/38 (EP,US);
G05B15/02 (US);
G06F8/76 (EP,US);
G06F9/451 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/41] |
Former [2015/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Systeme, Verfahren, und Software zur Darstellung von Mensch-Maschine-Schnittstellen auf einer mobilen Vorrichtung | [2015/09] | English: | Systems, methods, and software to present human machine interfaces on a mobile device | [2015/09] | French: | Systèmes, procédés et logiciel pour présenter des interfaces homme-machine sur un dispositif mobile | [2015/09] | Examination procedure | 25.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/41] | 01.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 11.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.01.2018 | 15.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/22] | 15.01.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 25.01.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/22] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 11.12.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 11.12.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.12.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2012229499 (TSAO CHENG-LIN [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0060]; figure 2 ** paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0066]; figure 3 * |