EP2808268 - Equipment to treat bulk products, flexible container or bag for bulk products and process for treating bulk products by such equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2015 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aguilar Monforte, Carlos C. La Vinya, 35 08480 L'Ametlla del Vallès / ES | [2014/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/49] | Representative(s) | Ponti & Partners, S.L.P Edifici PRISMA Av. Diagonal núm. 611-613, Planta 2 08028 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2014/49] | Oficina Ponti, SLP C. Consell de Cent, 322 08007 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 14170601.0 | 30.05.2014 | [2014/49] | Priority number, date | ES20130030674U | 30.05.2013 Original published format: ES 201330674 U | [2014/49] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2808268 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/20, B65D88/16, B65B55/00, B65B31/04, B65B57/00 | [2014/49] | CPC: |
B65D81/2084 (EP);
B65B31/047 (EP);
B65B57/00 (EP);
B65D88/1606 (EP);
G01N1/2226 (EP);
B65D2201/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Ausrüstung zur Behandlung von Schüttgut, flexibler Behälter oder Beutel für Schüttgut und Verfahren zur Behandlung von Schüttgut durch solch eine Ausrüstung | [2014/49] | English: | Equipment to treat bulk products, flexible container or bag for bulk products and process for treating bulk products by such equipment | [2014/49] | French: | Équipement pour traiter des produits en vrac, récipient ou sac flexible pour produits en vrac et procédé de traitement de produits en vrac par un tel appareil | [2014/49] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/49] | 04.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/03] | 10.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/03] | 30.07.2015 | Request for conversion into a national application, for ES [2015/37] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2013098785 (STEFFENS MARCOS ANDRE [SG]) [X] 1,10,14 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010]; figures 3,5,7-9,12,19 * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0069] *; | [Y]ES2340898 (PROTECTPACK S L AG [ES]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0656852 (NORSK HYDRO AS [NO], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 1, line 44 - line 52; figures 8-10; claims 1-2 * * column 4, line 5 - column 5, line 9 *; | [A]US2002078661 (BOWDEN LISA A [US], et al) [A] 1,10,15 * figures 14-15 *; | [A]US5299917 (SCHULTZ GLEN R [US]) [A] 7 * column 7, line 61 - column 8, line 2; figures 11,13 *; | [A]US5558137 (FUTERMAN CHARLES S [GB]) [A] 1,10 * column 3, line 7 - column 4, line 3; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2008057163 (KEGLER ANDREW [US], et al) [A] 1,10,15 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0048]; figures 3-4 * |