EP2808866 - Method and apparatus for automatic speaker-based speech clustering [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nuance Communications, Inc. One Wayside Road Burlington, MA 01803 / US | [2014/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Colibro, Daniels Ernesto Via Casalbaglianlo 47/T 15121 Alessandra / IT | 02 /
Vair, Claudio Via Felice Falco, 87 TO 10050 Brogone Susa / IT | 03 /
Farrell, Kevin R. 25 Norwich Circle Medford, MA Massachusetts 02155 / US | [2014/49] | Representative(s) | Suèr, Steven Johannes, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks TN13 3AJ / GB | [2014/49] | Application number, filing date | 14170662.2 | 30.05.2014 | [2014/49] | Priority number, date | US201313907364 | 31.05.2013 Original published format: US201313907364 | [2014/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2808866 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G10L17/04, G06K9/62 | [2014/49] | CPC: |
G10L17/04 (EP,US);
G10L15/063 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/29] |
Former [2014/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für automatisches sprecherbasiertes Sprachclustering | [2014/49] | English: | Method and apparatus for automatic speaker-based speech clustering | [2014/49] | French: | Procédé et appareil de regroupement de parole automatique basé sur un locuteur | [2014/49] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/29] | 21.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/04] | 08.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - XAVIER ANGUERA MIRO ET AL, "Speaker Diarization: A Review of Recent Research", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON AUDIO, SPEECH AND LANGUAGE PROCESSING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, USA, (20120201), vol. 20, no. 2, doi:10.1109/TASL.2011.2125954, ISSN 1558-7916, pages 356 - 370, XP011398123 [I] 1-8,10-15 * section A "Main approaches"; subsetion 1) Bottom-Up Approach; page 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TASL.2011.2125954 | [I] - MICKAEL ROUVIER ET AL, "A Global Optimization Framework For Speaker Diarization", ODYSSEY 2012: THE SPEAKER AND LANGUAGE RECOGNITION WORKSHOP, (20120625), pages 1 - 5, XP055140140 [I] 1-8,10-15 * section 1; page 2, paragraph 2 * | [I] - WEI-HO TSAI ET AL, "Clustering Speech Utterances by Speaker Using Eigenvoice-Motivated Vector Space Models", 2005 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING - 18-23 MARCH 2005 - PHILADELPHIA, PA, USA, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, (20050318), vol. 1, doi:10.1109/ICASSP.2005.1415216, ISBN 978-0-7803-8874-1, pages 725 - 728, XP010792140 [I] 1-8,10-15 * page 726, column 1, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.2005.1415216 | [A] - JIYEON CHOO ET AL, MOSAIC: A Proximity Graph Approach for Agglomerative Clustering, 20070903, PAGE(S) 231 - 240, (20070903), ISBN 978-3-540-74552-5, XP019098992 [A] 1-15 * section 2.2; Equations 1 and 4; page 235 * * page 232; figure 2 * | [A] - SOLOMONOFF A ET AL, "Clustering speakers by their voices", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 1998. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1998 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SEATTLE, WA, USA 12-15 MAY 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980512), vol. 2, doi:10.1109/ICASSP.1998.675375, ISBN 978-0-7803-4428-0, pages 757 - 760, XP010279341 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1998.675375 | [A] - P ROUSSEEUW, "Silhouettes: A graphical aid to the interpretation and validation of cluster analysis", JOURNAL OF COMPUTATIONAL AND APPLIED MATHEMATICS, (19871101), vol. 20, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0377-0427(87)90125-7, ISSN 0377-0427, pages 53 - 65, XP055004128 [A] 1-15 * section 2; page 55 - page 56 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0377-0427(87)90125-7 |