EP2811456 - Filtering method and device in image processing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2014/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fu, Xuan 13F Tower A, Ocean International Center No. 56 Dong Si Huan Zhong Rd. Chaoyang District 100025 Beijing / CN | 02 /
Ye, Jiangli 13F Tower A, Ocean International Center No. 56 Dong Si Huan Zhong Rd. Chaoyang District 100025 Beijing / CN | [2014/50] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2014/50] | Application number, filing date | 14170903.0 | 03.06.2014 | [2014/50] | Priority number, date | CN20131227302 | 08.06.2013 Original published format: CN201310227302 | [2014/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2811456 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2811456 | Date: | 01.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/00 | [2014/50] | CPC: |
G06T5/70 (EP,US);
G06T5/40 (EP,US);
H04N1/62 (US);
G06T2207/20012 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20021 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20024 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/37] |
Former [2014/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Filterverfahren und -vorrichtung bei der Bildverarbeitung | [2014/50] | English: | Filtering method and device in image processing | [2014/50] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de filtrage dans le traitement de l'image | [2014/50] | Examination procedure | 30.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/37] | 29.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/11] | 07.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010040305 (KIM KIL-TAE [KR]) [X] 1,17* paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0040] *; | [XYI] - HAGG W ET AL, "EFFICIENT SPECKLE FILTERING OF SAR IMAGES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL GEOSCIENCE AND REMOTE SENSING SYMPOSIUM (IGARSS). PASADENA, AUG. 8 -12, 1994; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL GEOSCIENCE AND REMOTE SENSING SYMPOSIUM (IGARSS)], NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19940808), vol. 4, doi:10.1109/IGARSS.1994.399674, ISBN 978-0-7803-1498-6, pages 2140 - 2142, XP000493036 [X] 1-4,9,16,17,20 * page 2141 * [Y] 5-7,18,19 [I] 8,10-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IGARSS.1994.399674 | [Y] - XIAOWEI LI ET AL, "A novel speckle filtering technique for SAR image", SIGNAL PROCESSING, 2002 6TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON AUG. 26-30, 2002, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20020826), vol. 1, ISBN 978-0-7803-7488-1, pages 788 - 791, XP010628106 [Y] 5-7,18,19 * the whole document * |