EP2779656 - Quantization matrix design for HEVC standard [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.08.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.09.2015 [2015/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2014/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haque, Munsi c/o Sony Corporation of America - California Intellectual Property Department 16530 Via Esprillo MZ7190 San Diego, California 92127-1898 / US | 02 /
Tabatabai, Ali c/o Sony Corporation of America - California Intellectual Property Department 16530 Via Esprillo MZ7190 San Diego, California 92127-1898 / US | [2014/38] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/38] | Turner, James Arthur D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 14171373.5 | 08.01.2013 | [2014/38] | Priority number, date | US201261589265P | 20.01.2012 Original published format: US 201261589265 P | US201213597131 | 28.08.2012 Original published format: US201213597131 | [2014/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2779656 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/126, H04N19/159, H04N19/463 | [2014/38] | CPC: |
H04N19/126 (EP,US);
H04N19/159 (EP,US);
H04N19/463 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/38] | Title | German: | Quantisierungsmatrixdesign für HEVC-Standard | [2014/38] | English: | Quantization matrix design for HEVC standard | [2014/38] | French: | Conception d'une matrice de quantification pour standard HEVC | [2014/38] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/38] | 18.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/39] | 24.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/39] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13150526.5 / EP2618574 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - MUNSI HAQUE ET AL, "HVS Model based Default Quantization Matrices", 7. JCT-VC MEETING; 98. MPEG MEETING; 21-11-2011 - 30-11-2011; GENEVA; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20111111), no. JCTVC-G880, XP030110864 [X] 1-5,7-11,13 * the whole document * [Y] 6,12 | [YP] - MUNSI HAQUE ET AL, "High-level Syntaxes for the Scaling List Matrices Parameters and Parametric coding", 8. JCT-VC MEETING; 99. MPEG MEETING; 1-2-2012 - 10-2-2012; SAN JOSE; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20120121), no. JCTVC-H0460, XP030111487 [YP] 6,12 * the whole document * | [AP] - HAQUE M ET AL, "On HVS only Default Scaling List Matrices", 8. JCT-VC MEETING; 99. MPEG MEETING; 1-2-2012 - 10-2-2012; SAN JOSE; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20120121), no. JCTVC-H0461, XP030111488 [AP] 1-13 * the whole document * | [Y] - MAANI E ET AL, "Parameterization of Default Quantization Matrices", 7. JCT-VC MEETING; 98. MPEG MEETING; 21-11-2011 - 30-11-2011; GENEVA; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20111109), no. JCTVC-G352, XP030110336 [Y] 6,12 * the whole document * |