EP2955978 - Lighting circuits, luminaries and methods compatible with phase-cut mains supplies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silergy Semiconductor (Hong Kong) Limited 15/F., BOC Group Life Assurance Tower 136 Des Voeux Road Central Central Hong Kong / CN | [2023/32] |
Former [2021/26] | For all designated states Silergy Semiconductor (Hong Kong) Limited 15/F., BOC Group Life Assurance Tower 136 Des Voeux Road Central Central Hong Kong / HK | ||
Former [2016/29] | For all designated states Silergy Corp. Oleander Way 802 West Bay Road P.O. Box 32052 Grand Cayman KY1-1208 / KY | ||
Former [2015/51] | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van den Broeke, Leendert c/o NXP B.V., Intellectual Property & Licensing Red Central 60 High Street Redhill Redhill, Surrey RH1 1SH / GB | [2015/51] | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2023/32] |
Former [2015/51] | Hardingham, Christopher Mark NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing Red Central 60 High Street Redhill, Surrey RH1 1SH / GB | Application number, filing date | 14171661.3 | 09.06.2014 | [2015/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2955978 | Date: | 16.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2955978 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/10, H05B45/10, H05B45/3725 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
H05B45/3725 (EP,US);
H05B45/10 (EP,US);
H05B45/38 (EP,US);
H05B45/385 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/51] | H05B33/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/28] |
Former [2015/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Beleuchtungsschaltung, Leuchten und mit Phasenschnitt-Stromnetzen kompatible Verfahren | [2015/51] | English: | Lighting circuits, luminaries and methods compatible with phase-cut mains supplies | [2015/51] | French: | Circuits d'éclairage, luminaires et procédés compatibles avec une alimentation secteur à coupure de phase | [2015/51] | Examination procedure | 14.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/28] | 15.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.08.2023 | CZ | 09.08.2023 | DK | 09.08.2023 | EE | 09.08.2023 | ES | 09.08.2023 | FI | 09.08.2023 | HR | 09.08.2023 | IT | 09.08.2023 | LT | 09.08.2023 | LV | 09.08.2023 | NL | 09.08.2023 | PL | 09.08.2023 | RO | 09.08.2023 | RS | 09.08.2023 | SE | 09.08.2023 | SI | 09.08.2023 | SK | 09.08.2023 | SM | 09.08.2023 | NO | 09.11.2023 | GR | 10.11.2023 | IS | 09.12.2023 | PT | 11.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
IT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 09.08.2023 | |
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007182338 (SHTEYNBERG ANATOLY [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0088]; figure 8 *; | [I]US2011121754 (SHTEYNBERG ANATOLY [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0181]; figure 16 *; | [A]US2012126714 (DEPPE CARSTEN [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0061] *; | [A]WO2013035045 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 10 - page 14, line 2 *; | [A]US2014001979 (MERCIER FREDERIC [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0033] *; | [A]US2014063857 (PENG HAO [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0081] *; | [A]US2014103823 (KAHLMAN HENRICUS MARIUS JOSEPH MARIA [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0078] *; | [A]US2014111113 (DEL CARMEN JR JOSE R [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0048]; figure 3 *; | [XI]WO2014072847 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1,4,9,11 * page 1, line 7 - page 16, line 32; figure 3 * [I] 2,3,5-8,10,12-15; | [A]GB2507982 (TRIDONIC GMBH & CO KG [AT]) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [A] - FREDERIC MERCIER ET AL, "A dimmable power supply unit for testing LED lamps built around a dedicated integrated circuit", INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS (ISIE), 2011 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, (20110627), doi:10.1109/ISIE.2011.5984339, ISBN 978-1-4244-9310-4, pages 1257 - 1262, XP032019237 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISIE.2011.5984339 | Examination | US2013057167 |