EP2954951 - Carrier catalyst and method for producing a porous graphitised carbon material coated with metal nanoparticles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SM | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heraeus Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Heraeusstr. 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | [2015/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neumann, Christian Am Grenzwall 30 35410 Hungen / DE | 02 /
Becker, Jörg Waldstrasse 16 61194 Niddatal / DE | 03 /
Pihan, Sascha Schneebergstraße 39a 63743 Aschaffenburg / DE | 04 /
Walter, Richard Heideweg 11 63755 Alzenau / DE | 05 /
Lässig, Walter Am Rückersberg 35 63571 Gelnhausen / DE | 06 /
Eweiner, Florian Büdesheimer Ring 6a 63452 Hanau / DE | 07 /
Kiemel, Rainer Feldbergring 119 63505 Langenselbold / DE | 08 /
Przibilla, Gabriele Hermann-Ehlers-Str. 101 63456 Hanau / DE | 09 /
Breuer, Christian Osannstrasse 4 64285 Darmstadt / DE | 10 /
Neuschütz, Mark Datterichweg 17 64367 Mühltal / DE | [2023/31] |
Former [2015/51] | 01 /
Neumann, Christian Am Grenzwall 30 35410 Hungen / DE | ||
02 /
Becker, Jörg Waldstrasse 16 61194 Niddatal / DE | |||
03 /
Pihan, Sascha Schneebergstraße 39a 63743 Aschaffenburg / DE | |||
04 /
Walter, Richard Heideweg 11 63755 Alzenau / DE | |||
05 /
Lässig, Walter Am Rückersberg 35 63571 Gelnhausen / DE | |||
06 /
Erweiner, Florian Büdesheimer Ring 6a 63452 Hanau / DE | |||
07 /
Kiemel, Rainer Feldbergring 119 63505 Langenselbold / DE | |||
08 /
Przibilla, Gabriele Hermann-Ehlers-Str. 101 63456 Hanau / DE | |||
09 /
Breuer, Christian Osannstrasse 4 64285 Darmstadt / DE | |||
10 /
Neuschütz, Mark Datterichweg 17 64367 Mühltal / DE | Representative(s) | Staudt, Armin Walter Sandeldamm 24a 63450 Hanau / DE | [2023/31] |
Former [2015/51] | Staudt, Armin Walter Patentanwalt Sandeldamm 24a 63450 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 14172024.3 | 11.06.2014 | [2015/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2954951 | Date: | 16.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2954951 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B01J37/08, B01J37/14, B01J23/38, B01J23/42, B01J35/00, B01J35/10, B01J37/02, H01M4/92 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
C01B32/20 (EP,KR,US);
B01J37/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J23/38 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J23/42 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J35/393 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J35/613 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J35/615 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J35/638 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J35/653 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J35/657 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J35/66 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J35/695 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J37/0018 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J37/0203 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J37/084 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J37/14 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C01B32/05 (EP,KR,US);
C01B32/205 (EP,US);
C01B32/21 (EP,US);
H01M4/8605 (KR,US);
H01M4/8817 (KR,US);
H01M4/8842 (KR,US);
H01M4/926 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M2008/1095 (KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/51] | B01J37/08, B01J37/14, B01J23/38, B01J23/42, B01J35/00, B01J35/10, B01J37/02, C01B31/02, C01B31/04, H01M4/92 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/29] |
Former [2015/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Trägerkatalysator sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung eines mit Metall-Nanopartikeln belegten, porösen graphitisierten Kohlenstoffmaterials | [2015/51] | English: | Carrier catalyst and method for producing a porous graphitised carbon material coated with metal nanoparticles | [2015/51] | French: | Catalyseur sur support et procédé de fabrication d'un matériau de carbone graphité poreux, revêtu de nanoparticules métalliques | [2015/51] | Examination procedure | 10.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/29] | 11.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | LT | 02.08.2023 | LV | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | PT | 04.12.2023 | [2024/20] |
Former [2024/10] | FI | 02.08.2023 | |
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 02.08.2023 | |
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 02.08.2023 | |
GR | 03.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6780350 (KODAS TOIVO T [US], et al) [I] 8* claim 4 *; | [YD]WO2013117725 (STUDIENGESELLSCHAFT KOHLE MBH [DE]) [YD] 1-16 * page 4, line 17 - line 33 * * page 12, line 29 - line 32 * * page 13, line 1 - line 19 *; | [Y]US2013209891 (NEUMANN CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) [Y] 1-16 * paragraphs [0004] , [0051] , [0054] , [0061] - [0064] * | by applicant | US4551220 | EP0450849 | EP0676050 | US6967183 | US7144652 | US7488699 | US7687187 | WO2013117725 | - NATURE MATERIALS, (201310), vol. 12, page 919 |