EP2954896 - Small molecule inhibitors of the E3 Ligase Skp2 in depression and other diseases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2017 [2017/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Hofgartenstraße 8 80539 München / DE | [2015/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gassen, NILS Schellingstrasse 42 80799 Munich / DE | 02 /
Rein THEO Am Schnepfenweg 60A 80995 Munich / DE | [2015/51] | Representative(s) | Arth, Hans-Lothar ABK Patent Attorneys Jasminweg 9 14052 Berlin / DE | [2015/51] | Application number, filing date | 14172399.9 | 13.06.2014 | [2015/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2954896 | Date: | 16.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/136, A61K31/167, A61P25/00 | [2015/51] | CPC: |
A61K31/136 (EP);
A61K31/167 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kleinmolekulare Hemmer der E3-Ligase-SKP2 bei Depression und anderen Erkrankungen | [2015/51] | English: | Small molecule inhibitors of the E3 Ligase Skp2 in depression and other diseases | [2015/51] | French: | Inhibiteurs à petite molécule de la ligase de Skp2 E3 dans la dépression et d'autres maladies | [2015/51] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/01] | 27.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDY]WO2009025854 (BURNHAM INST MEDICAL RESEARCH [US], et al) [XD] 1,8,9 * abstract * * page 32, line 26 - page 33, line 12 * * page 41, line 29 - page 43, line 25 * [Y] 2,6,8,10; | [Y]WO2006079792 (UNIV CAMBRIDGE TECH [GB], et al) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * page 7, line 15 - page 8, line 11 * * claims 18, 35-38 *; | [Y]WO03068939 (CHIRON CORP [US], et al) [Y] 2,6,10 * abstract * * page 44, line 17 - line 25 * | [XY] - RICO-BAUTISTA ELIZABETH ET AL, "Chemical genetics approach to restoring p27Kip1 reveals novel compounds with antiproliferative activity in prostate cancer cells", BMC BIOLOGY, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, GB, (20101223), vol. 8, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1741-7007-8-153, ISSN 1741-7007, page 153, XP021089523 [X] 9 * the whole document * [Y] 2,6,8,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1741-7007-8-153 | [X] - STARMER G A ET AL, "Analgesic potency and acute toxicity of substituted anilides and benzamides", TOXICOLOGY AND APPLIED PHARMACOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 19, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0041-008X(71)90185-2, ISSN 0041-008X, (19710501), pages 20 - 28, (19710501), XP024884216 [X] 9 * abstract * * page 22 - page 23; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0041-008X(71)90185-2 | [Y] - Q. CHEN ET AL, "Targeting the p27 E3 ligase SCFSkp2 results in p27- and Skp2-mediated cell-cycle arrest and activation of autophagy", BLOOD, (20080501), vol. 111, no. 9, doi:10.1182/blood-2007-09-112904, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 4690 - 4699, XP055167630 [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * page 4692; figure 1 * * page 4694 * * page 4697 - page 4698 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2007-09-112904 | by applicant | WO2009025854 | - RUBINSZTEIN ET AL., REVIEWS DRUG DISCOVERY, (2012), vol. 11, page 709 | - WU ET AL., CHEMISTRY AND BIOLOGY, (2012), vol. 19, no. 12, pages 1515 - 1524 | - GOMES ET AL., AUTOPHAGY IN ANTIMICROBIAL IMMUNITY; MOLECULAR CELL, (2014), vol. 54, no. 2, pages 224 - 233 | - LEVINE ET AL., NATURE, (2011), vol. 469, pages 323 - 335 | - PY ET AL., AUTOPHAGY, (2007), vol. 3, no. 2, pages 117 - 25 | - LIANG ET AL., J VIROL, (1998), vol. 72, no. 11, pages 8586 - 8596 | - CAMPBELL; SPECTOR, CURRENT OPINION IN MICROBIOLOGY, (2013), vol. 16, pages 349 - 354 | - GEDDES JR; MIKLOWITZ DJ, LANCET, (2013), vol. 381, pages 1672 - 1682 | - KLENGEL T ET AL., NAT. NEUROSCI., (2013), vol. 16, pages 33 - 41 | - ATTWOOD BK ET AL., NATURE, (2011), vol. 473, pages 372 - 375 | - HARTMANN J ET AL., NEUROPHARMACOLOGY, (2012), vol. 62, pages 332 - 339 | - WOCHNIK GM ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2005), vol. 280, pages 4609 - 4616 | - LIVAK; SCHMITTGEN, METHODS, (2001), vol. 25, pages 402 - 408 | - CORMAN ET AL., JOURNAL OF CLINICAL VIROLOGY, (2014), vol. 60, pages 168 - 171 | - TOUMA C ET AL., BIOL. PSYCHIATRY, (2011), vol. 70, pages 928 - 936 | - WOLFF ET AL., J. PSYCHIATR. RES., (2011), vol. 45, pages 256 - 261 | - REFOJO ET AL., SCIENCE, (2011), vol. 333, pages 1903 - 1907 | - HENNINGS JM ET AL., "Clinical characteristics and treatment outcome in a representative sample of depressed inpatients - findings from the Munich Antidepressant Response Signature (MARS) project", J. PSYCHIATR. RES., (2009), vol. 43, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jpsychires.2008.05.002, pages 215 - 229, XP025839063 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jpsychires.2008.05.002 | - OVERALL JE; RHOADES HM, "Use of the Hamilton Rating Scale for classification of depressive disorders", COMPR. PSYCHIATRY, (1982), vol. 23, doi:doi:10.1016/0010-440X(82)90087-6, pages 370 - 376, XP022965318 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0010-440X(82)90087-6 |