EP2845613 - Apparatus for sealing a vascular puncture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.08.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Incept, LLC 6 Porter Lane Lexington, MA 02420 / US | [2015/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Khosravi, Farhad 25698 Elena Road Los Altos Hills, CA California 94022 / US | 02 /
Pai, Suresh, S. 680 Orange Avenue Los Altos, California 94022 / US | 03 /
Bagaoisan, Celso, J. 4441 Pomponi Street Union City, CA California 94587 / US | 04 /
Amar, Sawhney 6 Porter Lane Lexington, MA Massachusetts 02420 / US | [2015/11] | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Postfach 70 04 25 81304 München / DE | [2021/02] |
Former [2015/11] | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Poccistrasse 11 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14173284.2 | 01.11.2005 | [2015/11] | Priority number, date | US20040982387 | 05.11.2004 Original published format: US 982387 | US20040982384 | 05.11.2004 Original published format: US 982384 | [2015/11] | Previously filed application, date | WO2005US39692 | 01.11.2005 | [2015/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2845613 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2845613 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61L31/14, A61B17/00, // A61K9/00 | [2020/32] | CPC: |
A61B17/0057 (EP,US);
A61B17/00491 (EP,US);
A61K9/0024 (EP,US);
A61L26/0052 (US);
A61L26/008 (US);
A61L27/58 (US);
A61L31/042 (US);
A61L31/044 (US);
A61L31/046 (US);
A61L31/048 (US);
A61L31/06 (US);
A61L31/145 (EP,US);
A61L31/148 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00004 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00495 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00637 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0065 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00654 (EP,US);
A61L2300/232 (US);
A61L2300/252 (US);
A61L2300/418 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61L31/145, C08L71/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/11] | A61L31/14, A61L27/52 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/11] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Versiegelung einer vaskulären Punktur | [2015/11] | English: | Apparatus for sealing a vascular puncture | [2015/11] | French: | Appareil de scellement d'une ponction vasculaire | [2015/11] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2014 | Examination requested [2015/11] | 11.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05824218.1 / EP1807132 | Opposition(s) | 14.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   31.05.2016 | 30.11.2016 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2017 | 30.11.2017 | 13   M06   Fee paid on   27.12.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.11.2005 | AT | 13.01.2021 | CY | 13.01.2021 | CZ | 13.01.2021 | DK | 13.01.2021 | EE | 13.01.2021 | ES | 13.01.2021 | FI | 13.01.2021 | LT | 13.01.2021 | LV | 13.01.2021 | MC | 13.01.2021 | PL | 13.01.2021 | RO | 13.01.2021 | SE | 13.01.2021 | SI | 13.01.2021 | SK | 13.01.2021 | TR | 13.01.2021 | BG | 13.04.2021 | GR | 14.04.2021 | IS | 13.05.2021 | PT | 13.05.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2023/29] | HU | 01.11.2005 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CY | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
CY | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
SE | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 13.01.2021 | |
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 13.01.2021 | |
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2001046518 (SAWHNEY AMARPREET S [US]) [A] 1,4-7 * paragraphs [0023] - [0034] - [0068] , [0130] , [0131] *; | [A]US2002072767 (ZHU YONG HUA [US]) [A] 1 * abstract ** paragraphs [0015] , [0041] - [0050] - [0062] - [0067] - [0072] - [0080] *; | [Y]US2002106409 (SAWHNEY AMARPREET S [US], et al) [Y] 1-17 * paragraphs [0021] , [0022] , [0033] - [0035] *; | [A]US2003051735 (PAVCNIK DUSAN [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0037] - [0039] - [0047] *; | [A]US6699261 (CATES CHRISTOPHER U [US], et al) [A] 1,12-14 * abstract *; | [Y]WO2004028404 (FIBROGEN INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0016] - [0020] - [0 35] , [0 38] , [0 68] - [0071] - [0087] * | by applicant | US5108421 | US5192302 | US5222974 | US6152943 | US6165201 | US6179862 | US6238412 | US6379373 | US2002114775 | US2003012734 | US6514534 | US2003078616 | US6605295 | US6635068 | US6703047 | US2004249342 | US2004267308 | US20040928744 | US20040975205 |