EP2957697 - Closure device for sliding doors and window or door [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.2018 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAUTAU GmbH Wilhelm-Hautau Strasse 2 31691 Helpsen / DE | [2017/23] |
Former [2015/52] | For all designated states HAUTAU GmbH Bahnhofstrasse 56-60 31691 Helpsen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Appel, Stephan Töpferweg 14 31679 Bückeburg / DE | 02 /
Mügge, Dirk Untere Str. 24 31688 Nienstädt / DE | [2016/07] |
Former [2015/52] | 01 /
Appel, Stepfan Töpferweg 14 31679 Bückeburg / DE | ||
02 /
Mügge, Dirk Untere Str. 24 31688 Nienstädt / DE | Representative(s) | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [2015/52] | Application number, filing date | 14173323.8 | 20.06.2014 | [2015/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2957697 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E05F5/00, E05F1/16 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
E05F5/003 (EP);
E05F1/16 (EP);
E05Y2800/24 (EP);
E05Y2800/244 (EP);
E05Y2900/132 (EP);
E05Y2900/148 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/30] |
Former [2015/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Einzugsvorrichtung für Schiebetüren und Fenster oder Tür | [2015/52] | English: | Closure device for sliding doors and window or door | [2015/52] | French: | Dispositif d'insertion pour portes coulissantes et fenêtre ou porte | [2015/52] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/30] | 21.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/26] | 14.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO2010143352 (TAKACHIHO KOEKI KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,10 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0027]; figures 4,5 * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0032]; figures 6,7 * [A] 5,14,15 [I] 9,11-13; | [XAI]US2013088132 (HAMMERLE HERMANN [AT]) [X] 1-8,10,12,14 * paragraphs [0045] - [0052] - [0062]; figures 2-9 * [A] 11,13,15 [I] 9; | [X]DE102010047485 (ZIMMER GUENTHER [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,7-10,13-15 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0086]; figures 1-20 *; | [A]KR20120002183 (SAMWOO CORP [KR]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE202014001516U |