EP2797239 - A method and a telecommunication device for selecting a number of code channels and an associated spreading factor for a CDMA transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Revocation of patent | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2019/36] |
Former [2014/44] | For all designated states Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Michel, Juergen Perhamer Str. 18 80687 Munich / DE | 02 /
Raaf, Bernhard Knollerweg 14 82061 Neuried / DE | [2014/44] | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/36] | Borgström, Markus, et al Nokia Solutions and Networks GmbH & Co. KG T&I IPR Patent Administration St.-Martin-Straße 76 80240 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14173589.4 | 28.10.2005 | [2014/44] | Previously filed application, date | EP20080017706 | 28.10.2005 | [2014/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2797239 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2797239 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/707, H04J13/20 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
H04B1/707 (EP,BR,US);
H04J13/16 (KR);
H04J13/20 (EP,BR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/24] |
Former [2014/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Telekommunikationsvorrichtung zur Auswahl einer Anzahl von Kodekanälen und eines zugehörigen Spreizfaktors für CDMA-Übertragung | [2014/44] | English: | A method and a telecommunication device for selecting a number of code channels and an associated spreading factor for a CDMA transmission | [2014/44] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de télécommunications pour sélectionner un nombre de canaux de codage et un facteur de diffusion associé dans le cas d'une transmission AMRC | [2014/44] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/24] | 25.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05023669.4 / EP1780901 | EP08017706.6 / EP2009806 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.06.2019
13.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE TomTom Sales B.V. De Ruijterkade 154 1011 AC Amsterdam / NL Opponent's representative Grödl, Felix Veit Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | 02
05.06.2019
13.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Heselberger, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | 03
05.06.2019
13.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Bury GmbH & Co. KG Robert-Koch-Straße 1 32584 Löhne / DE Opponent's representative Gerstein, Hans Joachim Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Plathnerstraße 3A 30175 Hannover / DE | 04
05.06.2019
13.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE Opponent's representative Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Emmerling Patent- & Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Platz der Ideen 2 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | 05
05.06.2019
07.06.2021
WITHDRAWN Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Grosch, Marcus, et al, et al Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP Mollstrasse 42 68165 Mannheim / DE | [2023/26] |
Former [2023/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.06.2019
13.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE TomTom Sales B.V. De Ruijterkade 154 1011 AC Amsterdam / NL Opponent's representative Grödl, Felix Veit Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | ||
02
05.06.2019
13.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Heselberger, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | |||
03
05.06.2019
13.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Bury GmbH & Co. KG Robert-Koch-Straße 1 32584 Löhne / DE Opponent's representative Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | |||
04
05.06.2019
13.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE Opponent's representative Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Emmerling Patent- & Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Platz der Ideen 2 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
05
05.06.2019
07.06.2021
WITHDRAWN Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Grosch, Marcus, et al, et al Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP Mollstrasse 42 68165 Mannheim / DE | |||
Former [2021/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.06.2019
13.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE TomTom Sales B.V. De Ruijterkade 154 1011 AC Amsterdam / NL Opponent's representative Grödl, Felix Veit Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | ||
02
05.06.2019
13.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Heselberger, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | |||
03
05.06.2019
13.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Bury GmbH & Co. KG Robert-Koch-Straße 1 32584 Löhne / DE Opponent's representative Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Freundallee 13a 30173 Hannover / DE | |||
04
05.06.2019
13.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE Opponent's representative Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Emmerling Patent- & Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Platz der Ideen 2 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
05
05.06.2019
07.06.2021
WITHDRAWN Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Grosch, Marcus, et al, et al Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP Mollstrasse 42 68165 Mannheim / DE | |||
Former [2021/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.06.2019
13.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE TomTom Sales B.V. De Ruijterkade 154 1011 AC Amsterdam / NL Opponent's representative Grödl, Felix Veit Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | ||
02
05.06.2019
13.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Heselberger, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | |||
03
05.06.2019
13.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Bury GmbH & Co. KG Robert-Koch-Straße 1 32584 Löhne / DE Opponent's representative Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Freundallee 13a 30173 Hannover / DE | |||
04
05.06.2019
13.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE Opponent's representative Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Emmerling Patent- & Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Platz der Ideen 2 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
05
05.06.2019
13.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Grosch, Marcus, et al, et al Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP Mollstrasse 42 68165 Mannheim / DE | |||
Former [2019/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.06.2019
13.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE TomTom Sales B.V. De Ruijterkade 154 1011 AC Amsterdam / NL Opponent's representative Grödl, Felix Veit Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | ||
02
05.06.2019
13.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | |||
03
05.06.2019
13.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Bury GmbH & Co. KG Robert-Koch-Straße 1 32584 Löhne / DE Opponent's representative Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Freundallee 13a 30173 Hannover / DE | |||
04
05.06.2019
13.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE Opponent's representative Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Emmerling Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Platz der Ideen 2 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
05
05.06.2019
13.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Grosch, Marcus, et al, et al Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP Mollstrasse 42 68165 Mannheim / DE | |||
Former [2019/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE TomTom Sales B.V. De Ruijterkade 154 1011 AC Amsterdam / NL Opponent's representative Grödl, Felix Veit Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | ||
02
05.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | |||
03
05.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Bury GmbH & Co. KG Robert-Koch-Straße 1 32584 Löhne / DE Opponent's representative Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Freundallee 13a 30173 Hannover / DE | |||
04
05.06.2019
ADMISSIBLE Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE Opponent's representative Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Emmerling Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Platz der Ideen 2 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | 21.06.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.11.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 30.06.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.10.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 01.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 12.03.2024 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2024/27] | Appeal following opposition | 10.12.2021 | Appeal received No. T2194/21 | 10.12.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 11.02.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 12.03.2024 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 26.03.2024 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 12.03.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.10.2005 | AT | 05.09.2018 | CY | 05.09.2018 | CZ | 05.09.2018 | DK | 05.09.2018 | EE | 05.09.2018 | ES | 05.09.2018 | FI | 05.09.2018 | IT | 05.09.2018 | LT | 05.09.2018 | LV | 05.09.2018 | MC | 05.09.2018 | NL | 05.09.2018 | PL | 05.09.2018 | RO | 05.09.2018 | SE | 05.09.2018 | SI | 05.09.2018 | SK | 05.09.2018 | TR | 05.09.2018 | LU | 28.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | BG | 05.12.2018 | GR | 06.12.2018 | IS | 05.01.2019 | PT | 05.01.2019 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 28.10.2005 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LU | 28.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LU | 28.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
LU | 28.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
LU | 28.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
LU | 28.10.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
DK | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
LU | 28.10.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
LU | 28.10.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
LU | 28.10.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
ES | 05.09.2018 | ||
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 05.09.2018 | |
FI | 05.09.2018 | ||
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 05.09.2018 | |
IT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | FI | 05.09.2018 | |
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
NL | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | FI | 05.09.2018 | |
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 05.09.2018 | |
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
SE | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 05.09.2018 | |
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 05.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2001026543 (HWANG SUNG-OH [KR], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0329] - [0349]; figure 30 *; | [A]US2005157687 (HEO YOUN-HYOUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [XD] - "UNIVERSAL MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM (UMTS); MULTIPLEXING AND CHANNEL CODING (FDD)", ETSI STANDARDS, LIS, SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, FRANCE, (20050901), no. V6.6.0, ISSN 0000-0001, pages 1 - 86, XP002371253 [XD] 1-11 * page 67 - page 68 * | [A] - "3GPP TSG RAN WG1 MEETING #41", (20050509), INTERNET CITATION, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/TSG_ran/TSGR_28/Docs/PDF/RP-050252.pdf, (20060309), XP002371254 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | Opposition | EP1594247 | KR20050034772 | EP1717982 | EP1780901 | EP2009806 | EP2797239 | WO2005020473 | - "Universal Mobile Telekommunications System (UMTS); Multiplexing and Channel Coding (FDD)", ETSI Standard TS 25.212 V6.6.0, (20050109), pages 1 - 86, XP002371253 | - 3GPP, "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Physical channels and mapping of transport channels onto physical channels (FDD) (Release 6)", 3GPP TS 25.211 V6.0.0, (20050928), pages 1 - 50, XP055608928 | - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Multiplexing and channel coding (FDD) (Release 6)", 3GPP Standard; 3GPP TS 25.212, (200503), no. V6.4.0, pages 67 - 68, XP050366755 | - "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); Multiplexing and channel coding (FDD) (3GPP TS 25.212 version 6.5.0 Release 6)", Technical Specification ETSI TS 125 212 V6.5.0, (200506), pages 67 - 68, XP014030540 | - Anonymous, "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); Multiplexing and channel coding (FDD) (3GPP TS 25 212 version 6.6.0 Release 6)", Technical Specification ETSI TS 125 212 V6.6.0 (2005-09), pages 67 - 68, XP055610611 | - Etsi, "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); Radio Resource Control (RRC) protocol specification (3GPP TS 25.331 version 6. 7.0 Release 6)", ETSI TS 125 331 V6.7.0, page 623, XP055446340 | - Samsung, "Determination of SF and number of PhCHs considering SF2", 3GPP Draft; R1-050434, Athens, vol. RAN WG1, XP050595978 | - Nokia; Samsung, "Usage of 2xSF4 with puncturing", 3GPP Draft; R1-051546, Seoul, Korea, (20051103), vol. RAN WG1, XP050101118 | - 3GPP, "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Multiplexing and channel coding (FDD) (Release 6)", 3GPP TS 25.212 V6.6.0, (20050927), pages 1 - 84, XP055608899 | - 3GPP, "3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP); Technical Specification Group (TSG); Radio Access Network(RAN); Working Group 1 (WG1) Multiplexing and channel coding (FDD)", 3GPP TS 25.212, V2.0.1, (19990800), pages 1 - 7, 22-24, 47, XP055608912 | - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Multiplexing and channel coding (FDD) (Release 6)", 3GPP TS 25.212 V6.6.0, (20050109), pages 1 - 84, XP055608899 | - "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); Physical layer - general description (3GPP TS 25.201 version 6.2.0 Release 6)", ETSI TS 125 201 V6.2.0 (2005-06), (20050600), pages 1 - 17, XP055628863 | - "Universal Mobile Telecommunications Systems (UMTS); Multi- plexing and Channel Coding (FDD", 3GPP TS 25.212 V2.0.1 (1999-08), LIS, Sophia Antipolis Cedex, France, (19990800), pages 1 - 47, XP055628866 | - Excerpt of Revised Minutes for 3GPP RAN-TSG 7th WGi Meeting | - "UNIVERSAL MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM (UMTS); MULTIPLEXING AND CHANNEL CODING (FDD", ETSI STANDARDS, LIS, SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, FRANCE, (20050901), ISSN 0000-0001, pages 1 - 86, XP002371253 |