EP2805934 - Cineole [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation Limestone Avenue Campbell, Australian Capital Territory 2612 / AU | [2014/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leita, Benjamin Aldo 4 Adrian Place Rowville Victoria 3178 / AU | 02 /
Grey, Peter 1/184 Brougham Street Kew, Victoria 3101 / AU | 03 /
Burke, Nicholas Richard 1/67 Lancaster Street Bentleigh East Victoria 3165 / AU | 04 /
O'Shea, Michael Shane 4 Worthing Court Mulgrave Victoria 3170 / AU | 05 /
Trimm, David Lawrence 17 Robertson Place Watsons Bay New South Wales 2030 / AU | [2014/48] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/48] | Jappy, John William Graham Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 14173766.8 | 26.02.2010 | [2014/48] | Priority number, date | AU20090903333 | 16.07.2009 Original published format: AU 2009903333 | [2014/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2805934 | Date: | 26.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07C13/00, B01J23/24, B01J23/74, B01J23/00, B01J23/28, B01J32/00, C07C1/247 | [2014/48] | CPC: |
C07C1/247 (EP,US);
B01J23/22 (EP,US);
B01J23/26 (EP,US);
B01J23/28 (EP,US);
B01J23/34 (EP,US);
B01J23/44 (EP,US);
B01J23/462 (EP,US);
B01J23/745 (EP,US);
B01J23/75 (EP,US);
B01J23/755 (EP,US);
B01J23/90 (EP,US);
B01J37/0201 (EP,US);
B01J38/12 (EP,US);
B01J21/04 (EP,US);
C07C2521/04 (EP,US);
C07C2523/22 (EP,US);
C07C2523/26 (EP,US);
C07C2523/28 (EP,US);
C07C2523/34 (EP,US);
C07C2523/36 (EP,US);
C07C2523/42 (EP,US);
C07C2523/44 (EP,US);
C07C2523/46 (EP,US);
C07C2523/50 (EP,US);
C07C2523/52 (EP,US);
C07C2523/745 (EP,US);
C07C2523/75 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C1/247, C07C13/20 (EP,US);
C07C1/247, C07C15/02 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/27] |
Former [2014/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Cineol | [2014/48] | English: | Cineole | [2014/48] | French: | Cinéole | [2014/48] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/27] | 01.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/06] | 04.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/06] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10799266.1 / EP2454221 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19521222 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * page 5, line 10 - page 6, line 22 * * page 7 - page 11; example - * * claim - *; | [A]DE19521225 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * page 2, line 35 - line 41 * * page 3, line 26 - line 37 * * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 35 * * page 6 - page 9; example - * * claim - *; | [A]US2857439 (GLASEBROOK ARTHUR L) [A] 1-15 * column 2 - column 4; examples 1-4 * * column 5, line 5 - column 6, line 10 * * claim - *; | [Y] - MATSUURA T ET AL, "Studies on Cineole, XII. Pyrolysis of Cineole with Activated Alumina", JOURNAL OF SCIENCE OF THE HIROSHIMA UNIVERSITY SERIES A: PHYSICS AND CHEMISTRY, HIROSHIMA UNIVERSITY, HIROSHIMA, JP, (19570201), vol. 20, no. 3, ISSN 0386-3034, pages 177 - 186, XP008150534 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - Isaac Mizrahi ET AL, "Reaction gas chromatography : II. Dehydrogenation of monoterpene compounds on platinum-alumina catalyst", Journal of Chromatography A, (19660101), pages 230 - 241, URL: http://ac.els-cdn.com/S002196730198238X/1-s2.0-S002196730198238X-main.pdf?_tid=cd440cb8ccd302ec9474a890e5f41e42&acdnat=1333552414_bc8f95fb96cd1ec8b924f162c3c883b7, (20120404), XP055023918 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9673(01)98238-X | [A] - HUGEL H M ET AL, "THE HYDROGENOLYSIS OF 1 8 CINEOLE", AUSTRALIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, CSIRO, AU, (19770101), vol. 30, no. 6, ISSN 0004-9425, pages 1287 - 1292, XP008150536 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1071/CH9771287 | [A] - ROBERGE D M ET AL, "Catalytic aspects in the transformation of pinenes to p-cymene", APPLIED CATALYSIS A: GENERAL, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20010713), vol. 215, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/S0926-860X(01)00514-2, ISSN 0926-860X, pages 111 - 124, XP004246314 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0926-860X(01)00514-2 | [A] - MARTIN-LUENGO M A ET AL, "Synthesis of p-cymene from limonene, a renewable feedstock", APPLIED CATALYSIS B: ENVIRONMENTAL, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 81, no. 3-4, doi:10.1016/J.APCATB.2007.12.003, ISSN 0926-3373, (20080624), pages 218 - 224, (20080212), XP022707569 [A] 1-15 * page 219, paragraph 2.1 - page 223, paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.apcatb.2007.12.003 |