EP2819289 - Boost type direct current output control circuit device controlled by subpower [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2019 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yang, Tai-Her No. 59 Chung Hsing 8 Street Si-Hu Town Dzan-Hwa / TW | [2015/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/01] | Representative(s) | Wright, Howard Hugh Burnby, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/01] | Wright, Howard Hugh Burnby, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 14173849.2 | 25.06.2014 | [2015/01] | Priority number, date | US201313927247 | 26.06.2013 Original published format: US201313927247 | [2015/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2819289 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2015/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2819289 | Date: | 18.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/156, // H02M3/335, H02M1/00 | [2015/47] | CPC: |
H02M3/156 (EP,US);
H02M3/22 (US);
H02M1/0093 (EP,US);
H02M3/335 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/01] | H02M3/156 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/25] |
Former [2015/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Durch Unterleistung gesteuerte Gleichstromausgabe-Steuerschaltungsvorrichtung vom Verstärkungstyp | [2015/01] | English: | Boost type direct current output control circuit device controlled by subpower | [2015/01] | French: | Dispositif de circuit de commande de sortie de courant direct de type élévateur commandé par alimentation secondaire | [2015/01] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/25] | 19.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/52] | 20.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6175219 (IMAMURA NORITOSHI [JP], et al) [I] 1-10 * figures 2A,4 *; | [I]US2005226012 (JOVANOVIC MILAN M [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * figures 6,19 *; | [I]US2007007933 (CHAN CHIH-CHIANG [TW], et al) [I] 1-10 * figure 5 *; | [I]US2009231883 (OSAKA SHOHEI [JP]) [I] 1-10 * figure 3 *; | [A]JP2010252513 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-10 * figures 2,10 *; | [I]US2011068723 (MAIOCCHI SERGIO A [AU]) [I] 1-10 * figures 7D-7G, 11B, 17E *; | [A]JP2012115112 (TRY TEC CORP) [A] 1-10* figure 2 *; | [I]JP2012200082 (NICHICON CORP) [I] 1-10 * figure 1 * |