EP2869652 - System for frequency management on LTE D2D communications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.04.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.05.2016 [2016/19] | 08.04.2016 | Change - applicant | published on 11.05.2016 [2016/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUMAX Co., Ltd Yeongmun-ro 2 (Yubang-dong) Cheoin-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 449-934 / KR | [2016/19] |
Former [2015/19] | For all designated states Humax Holdings Co., Ltd. 2, Yeongmun-ro Cheoin-gu Gyeonggi-do Yongin-si 449-934 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yie, Alex Chungku 16-406, 246, Buheung-ro, Bupyeong-gu 403-011 Incheon / KR | 02 /
Lee, Yongjae 407-1304, 193, Jangmi-ro, Bundang-gu, Gyeonggi-do 463-070 Seongnam-si / KR | 03 /
Ahn, Jun Bae 104-1904, 50, Taebong-ro, Gyeonggi-do 464-110 Gwangju-si / KR | [2015/19] | Representative(s) | Zardi, Marco M. Zardi & Co. SA Via Pioda 6 6900 Lugano / CH | [2015/19] | Application number, filing date | 14176187.4 | 08.07.2014 | [2015/19] | Priority number, date | KR20130080393 | 09.07.2013 Original published format: KR 20130080393 | KR20130080394 | 09.07.2013 Original published format: KR 20130080394 | KR20130095162 | 12.08.2013 Original published format: KR 20130095162 | KR20130095163 | 12.08.2013 Original published format: KR 20130095163 | KR20130095164 | 12.08.2013 Original published format: KR 20130095164 | KR20130139942 | 18.11.2013 Original published format: KR 20130139942 | KR20140008371 | 23.01.2014 Original published format: KR 20140008371 | KR20140036296 | 27.03.2014 Original published format: KR 20140036296 | KR20140036297 | 27.03.2014 Original published format: KR 20140036297 | KR20140036298 | 27.03.2014 Original published format: KR 20140036298 | KR20140036299 | 27.03.2014 Original published format: KR 20140036299 | KR20140036300 | 27.03.2014 Original published format: KR 20140036300 | KR20140058733 | 16.05.2014 Original published format: KR 20140058733 | KR20140058734 | 16.05.2014 Original published format: KR 20140058734 | KR20140078073 | 25.06.2014 Original published format: KR 20140078073 | KR20140078074 | 25.06.2014 Original published format: KR 20140078074 | KR20140081902 | 01.07.2014 Original published format: KR 20140081902 | [2015/19] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2869652 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04W76/02, H04W84/04 | [2015/19] | CPC: |
H04W72/0453 (EP,US);
H04W72/121 (EP);
H04W76/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | System für ein Frequenzmanagement von LTE Gerät-zu-Gerät (D2D) Kommunikation | [2015/19] | English: | System for frequency management on LTE D2D communications | [2015/19] | French: | Système de gestion de frequence pour des communications LTE de dispositif à dispositif (D2D) | [2015/19] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2014 | Examination requested [2015/19] | 07.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/19] | 15.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/19] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2013091229 (RENESAS MOBILE CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,14 * paragraphs [0007] , [0019] , [0020] , [0024] , [0034] , [0042] , [0046] , [0047] * * figure 4 * [I] 3-13,15-24; | [XI]US2011255450 (WANG RENQIU [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0032] , [0037] , [0111] * * figure 1 * [I] 2-24; | [XI]WO2009138820 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1,6 * abstract * * page 11, lines 8-16 * * page 13, lines 1-7 * * page 15, lines 23-25 * * page 17, lines 1-8,16-25 * * page 20, lines 13-25 * * page 20, line 31 - page 21, line 10 * * page 21, lines 27-31 * * page 22, lines 13-30 * * page 23, line 10 - page 24, line 13 * * tables 1-3 * * figures 2,3,5 * [I] 2-5,7-24; | [IA]WO2013081393 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [I] 1,2,18 * the whole document * [A] 3-17,19-24; | US2014321452 [ ] (CHOI JINSOO [KR], et al) [ ] * abstract * * paragraphs [0076] - [0083] - [0095] - [0107] - [0116] - [0168] * * figures 1,3,5,6 * | by applicant | KR20130013482 |