EP2790210 - Automated material handling system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.04.2023 [2023/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Murata Machinery, Ltd. 3 Minami Ochiai-cho Kisshoin Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8326 / JP | [2014/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Doherty, Brian J. 41 Cherry Brook Road Weston, MA Massachusetts 02493 / US | 02 /
Mariano, Thomas R. 9 E. Woodbine Drive Londonderry, NH New Hampshire 03053 / US | 03 /
Sullivan, Robert P. 32 Fairmont Avenue Wilmington, MA Massachusetts 01887 / US | [2014/42] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/42] | Beck, Alexander Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Maximilianstrasse 4b 82319 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 14176254.2 | 20.03.2003 | [2014/42] | Priority number, date | US20020389993P | 19.06.2002 Original published format: US 389993 P | US20020417993P | 11.10.2002 Original published format: US 417993 P | [2014/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2790210 | Date: | 15.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2790210 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2015/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/677 | [2014/42] | CPC: |
H01L21/67733 (EP,US);
H01L21/68 (KR);
B65G1/0457 (US);
G06F7/00 (KR);
H01L21/67736 (EP);
H01L21/67769 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/32] |
Former [2014/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Automatisiertes Materialhandhabungssystem | [2014/42] | English: | Automated material handling system | [2014/42] | French: | Système de manutention automatisé | [2014/42] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/32] | 23.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/17] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03761012.8 / EP1535143 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 09.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 09.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6113341 (FUKUSHIMA MASAZUMI [JP]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]JP2000255710 (HIRATA SPINNING) [X] 1-4* the whole document * |