EP2965900 - Method and device for producing flexible packaging products, in particular packaging bags [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2017 [2017/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cellpack AG Anglikerstrasse 99 5612 Villmergen / CH | [2016/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kropf, Martin Hofwilstrasse 20 3053 Münchenbuchsee / CH | [2016/02] | Representative(s) | AMMANN PATENTANWÄLTE AG Schwarztorstrasse 31 Postfach 5135 3001 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2016/02] | AMMANN PATENTANWÄLTE AG BERN Schwarztorstrasse 31 Postfach 5135 3001 Bern / CH | Application number, filing date | 14176376.3 | 09.07.2014 | [2016/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2965900 | Date: | 13.01.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B31B19/02, B65H5/16 | [2016/02] | CPC: |
B31B70/642 (EP,US);
B65H5/16 (EP,CN,US);
B31B70/005 (EP,US);
B65H20/20 (US);
B65H29/16 (EP,CN,US);
B65H5/021 (EP,CN,US);
B31B2150/00 (EP,US);
B31B2150/002 (EP,US);
B31B2160/10 (EP,US);
B31B2160/102 (EP,US);
B31B2160/106 (EP,US);
B31B70/006 (US);
B31B70/02 (EP,US);
B31B70/04 (US);
B31B70/10 (EP,US);
B31B70/16 (EP,US);
B31B70/64 (US);
B65H2404/234 (EP,CN,US);
B65H2404/264 (EP,CN,US);
B65H2404/3141 (EP,CN,US);
B65H2406/34 (EP,CN,US);
B65H2701/191 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung flexibler Verpackungserzeugnisse, insbesondere Verpackungsbeutel | [2016/02] | English: | Method and device for producing flexible packaging products, in particular packaging bags | [2016/02] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de fabrication d'ébauche d'emballage, notamment de sac d'emballage | [2016/02] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/02] | 24.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3448666 (KAPPELHOFF HERMANN, et al) [A] 1-15 * column 6, line 12 - column 7, line 63; figures 9a,9b *; | [A]DE4141466 (WINDMOELLER & HOELSCHER [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2009121838 (WINDMOELLER & HOELSCHER [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US5667122 (YOUNG JR WILLIAM O [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 12, lines 1-19; figure 7 *; | [A]EP1880834 (TOYO BOSEKI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * |